EP3598587 - VEHICLE-MOUNTED ELECTRIC CONNECTING DEVICE AND VEHICLE-MOUNTED CONNECTING APPARATUS FOR RAIL TRAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CRRC Qingdao Sifang Co., Ltd. No.88 Jinhongdong Road Chengyang District Qingdao City, Shandong 266111 / CN | [2020/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Dongyuan No.88 Jinhongdong Road Chengyang District Qingdao Shandong 266111 / CN | 02 /
XU, Baoshan No.88 Jinhongdong Road Chengyang District Qingdao Shandong 266111 / CN | 03 /
LI, Hao No.88 Jinhongdong Road Chengyang District Qingdao Shandong 266111 / CN | 04 /
YANG, Xiaolin No.88 Jinhongdong Road Chengyang District Qingdao Shandong 266111 / CN | 05 /
LI, Tao No.88 Jinhongdong Road Chengyang District Qingdao Shandong 266111 / CN | [2020/04] | Representative(s) | Carangelo, Pierluigi, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Tomacelli 146 00186 Roma / IT | [2020/04] | Application number, filing date | 18844870.8 | 14.05.2018 | [2020/04] | WO2018CN86723 | Priority number, date | CN201710674105 | 09.08.2017 Original published format: CN201710674105 | [2020/04] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019029210 | Date: | 14.02.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3598587 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3598587 | Date: | 12.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 14.02.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/627, B61G5/10 | [2020/50] | CPC: |
B61G5/10 (EP);
H01R2201/26 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/04] | H01R13/627 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGMONTIERTE ELEKTRISCHE VERBINDUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND FAHRZEUGMONTIERTE VERBINDUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR SCHIENENZUG | [2020/04] | English: | VEHICLE-MOUNTED ELECTRIC CONNECTING DEVICE AND VEHICLE-MOUNTED CONNECTING APPARATUS FOR RAIL TRAIN | [2020/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CONNEXION ÉLECTRIQUE MONTÉ SUR VÉHICULE ET APPAREIL DE CONNEXION MONTÉ SUR VÉHICULE FERROVIAIRE | [2023/01] |
Former [2020/04] | DISPOSITIF DE CONNEXION ÉLECTRIQUE MONTÉ SUR VÉHICULE ET APPAREIL DE CONNEXION MONTÉ SUR VÉHICULE POUR RAME DE LONGS RAILS SOUDÉS | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2019 | Translation filed | 17.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 17.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/04] | 24.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 12.04.2023 | AT | 12.04.2023 | CZ | 12.04.2023 | DK | 12.04.2023 | EE | 12.04.2023 | ES | 12.04.2023 | FI | 12.04.2023 | HR | 12.04.2023 | IT | 12.04.2023 | LT | 12.04.2023 | LV | 12.04.2023 | MC | 12.04.2023 | NL | 12.04.2023 | PL | 12.04.2023 | RO | 12.04.2023 | RS | 12.04.2023 | SE | 12.04.2023 | SI | 12.04.2023 | SK | 12.04.2023 | SM | 12.04.2023 | IE | 14.05.2023 | LU | 14.05.2023 | BE | 31.05.2023 | CH | 31.05.2023 | LI | 31.05.2023 | NO | 12.07.2023 | GR | 13.07.2023 | IS | 12.08.2023 | PT | 14.08.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
MC | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SI | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
IE | 14.05.2023 | ||
LU | 14.05.2023 | ||
BE | 31.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
MC | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
IE | 14.05.2023 | ||
LU | 14.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
MC | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
LU | 14.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
MC | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
LU | 14.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
LU | 14.05.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 12.04.2023 | |
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 12.04.2023 | |
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 12.04.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]GB1273481 (DRESSER IND [US]) [X] 1,2,8,9 * page 4, lines 70-86; figure 1 * [I] 3-7,10; | [A]US3678442 (COPE GEOFFREY W, et al) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE2414384 (BERGISCHE STAHLINDUSTRIE) [A] 1* figures 1, 2 *; | [XI]US4284311 (FORSTER HILMAR, et al) [X] 1,9 * figure 1 * [I] 2-8,10; | [A]JP2004149014 (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1 * figures 2, 4, 5 *; | [XI]JP2009234571 (YUTAKA SEISAKUSHO CO LTD) [X] 1,9 * paragraph [0014]; figures 2, 3 * [I] 2-8,10; | [XI]US2013196519 (KRAUSE JENS [DE], et al) [X] 1,9 * figures 1, 2 * [I] 2-8,10 | International search | CN201633862U [a] (SUNSHEN ENTPR CO LTD) [a] 1-10 * the whole document *; | CN102202919 [y] (WABCO GMBH) [y] 1-10; | CN107645101 [px] (CRRC QINGDAO SIFANG CO LTD)[px] 1-10; | [yY] - Yuan, Fengbiao et al., "Analysis and design of video surveillance system for the high speed EMU", Mechatronics, (20130220), no. 2, doi:10.396/j.issn.1007-080x.2013.02.009, pages 47 - 50, XP055637602 [y] 1-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.396/j.issn.1007-080x.2013.02.009 |