Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3667406
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
28.03.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.06.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
25.04.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.02.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.02.2023 |
First examination report |
|
26.04.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.10.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
01.05.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.03.2021 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] |
05.03.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] |
05.03.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] |
09.10.2020 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] |
09.10.2020 |
Change - extension states |
published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] |
15.05.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.06.2020 [2020/25] |
15.05.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.06.2020 [2020/25] |
20.04.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.03.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.03.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.03.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.02.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.02.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
19.02.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.02.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
26.02.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.02.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|