EP3667406 - DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2020/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HWANG, Woongjoon IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 02 /
HWANG, Jeonghwan IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 03 /
KIL, Hyongil IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Minho IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 05 /
PARK, Jinsin IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 06 /
BAEK, Heumseok IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 07 /
JUNG, Yongmin IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 08 /
JOUNG, Juyoung IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | [2020/25] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2020/25] | Application number, filing date | 18844889.8 | 18.04.2018 | [2020/25] | WO2018KR04512 | Priority number, date | KR20170100371 | 08.08.2017 Original published format: KR 20170100371 | [2020/25] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019031684 | Date: | 14.02.2019 | Language: | KO | [2019/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3667406 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.02.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1335, G02F1/13357, F21V8/00 | [2021/14] | CPC: |
G02F1/133603 (EP);
G02F1/133602 (KR);
G02B6/0088 (EP,US);
G02B6/0046 (EP,US);
G02B6/0055 (EP,US);
G02F1/1335 (EP);
G02F1/133524 (KR);
G02F1/133553 (KR);
G02F1/133605 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/25] | G02F1/1335 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/25] | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2020/25] | English: | DISPLAY DEVICE | [2020/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE | [2020/25] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2020 | Translation filed | 08.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 08.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/25] | 05.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]KR20090008749U (JAHWA LITEC CO LTD) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [Y]KR20110126577 (LG INNOTEK CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 4-6 * the whole document *; | [YA]US2012262645 (LI QUAN [CN], et al) [Y] 4-6 * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0042] * [A] 7,8; | [IAY]US2013094242 (YANG RUILIAN [CN]) [I] 1-3,9,10 * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0049] * [A] 7,8 [Y] 4-6; | [XAY]CN104864311 (GUANGZHOU SKYWORTH FLAT DISPLAY TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 1-3,9,10 * the whole document * [A] 7,8 [Y] 4-6 | International search | [XY]KR20160131549 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-2, 8-10 [Y] 3-7; | [Y]KR20110126577 (LG INNOTEK CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 3-7; | [A]KR20140142059 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-10; | [A]US2015378212 (JIA ZHISHUAI [CN], et al) [A] 1-10; | [A]KR20010016747 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-10 |