EP3664948 - PRE-SINTERED PREFORM AND PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.04.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Technology GmbH Brown Boveri Strasse 8 5400 Baden / CH | [2023/50] |
Former [2020/25] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CUI, Yan 300 Garlington Road Greenville, SC 29615 / US | 02 /
KOTTILINGAM, Srikanth Chandrudu 300 Garlington Road Greenville, SC 29615 / US | 03 /
TOLLISON, Brian Lee 300 Garlington Road Greenville, SC 29615 / US | 04 /
LAYLOCK, Matthew 300 Garlington Road Greenville, SC 29615 / US | 05 /
PLETCHER, Timothy 300 Garlington Road Greenville, SC 29615 / US | [2020/25] | Representative(s) | Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | [2020/25] | Application number, filing date | 18844936.7 | 02.08.2018 | [2020/25] | WO2018US44965 | Priority number, date | US201715670463 | 07.08.2017 Original published format: US201715670463 | [2020/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019032367 | Date: | 14.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3664948 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.02.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B22F3/10, B22F5/00, C22C1/04, C22C30/00, C22C27/06, B22F3/16, B22F1/00, C22C19/07, F01D5/22, F01D5/28, B22F5/10 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
B22F3/162 (EP,US);
B22F3/24 (KR);
B22F3/1007 (KR);
B22F5/00 (KR);
B23K1/00 (US);
C22C1/047 (KR);
C22C19/07 (EP,US);
C22C27/06 (KR);
C22C30/00 (EP,KR,US);
F01D25/005 (US);
F01D5/225 (EP,US);
F01D5/288 (EP,US);
B22F1/09 (EP,US);
B22F2201/20 (EP,US);
B22F2301/15 (US);
B22F2998/10 (EP,US);
B22F2999/00 (EP,US);
B22F5/106 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/10, B22F1/09, B22F3/10, B22F2003/247 (US,EP);
B22F2999/00, B22F3/10, B22F2201/20 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2020/25] | B22F3/24, B22F3/10, B22F5/00, C22C1/04, C22C30/00, C22C27/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/25] | Title | German: | VORGESINTERTE VORFORM UND VERFAHREN | [2020/25] | English: | PRE-SINTERED PREFORM AND PROCESS | [2020/25] | French: | PRÉFORME PRÉ-FRITTÉE ET PROCÉDÉ | [2020/25] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2020 | Search fee paid | 04.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/25] | 22.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2006134454 (SATHIAN SUJITH [US]) [X] 10 * figure 3 * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0021] *[A] 1-9; | [XY]US2015377037 (SALM JACOB ANDREW [US], et al) [X] 10 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraphs [0039] , [0 42] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0055] * [Y] 1-9; | [XY]US2016250725 (HENDERKOTT JOSEPH PETER [US], et al) [X] 10 * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0044] * [Y] 1-9 | International search | [A]US4849153 (MICHEL WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [A] 1-19 * See claims 1-8. *; | [A]EP1982781 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 1-19* See paragraphs [0008]-[0025]; and figures 1-2. *; | [A]US2015224607 (BRUCK GERALD J [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * See paragraphs [0076]-[0077]; and figure 15. *; | [A]US2015367456 (OZBAYSAL KAZIM [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * See paragraphs [0009]-[0053]; and claims 1-3. *; | [X]US2016199930 (YARBROUGH JAMES A [US]) [X] 1-19 * See paragraphs [0022]-[0050]; claims 5, 17; and figure 3. * |