EP3732308 - CAST IRON INOCULANT AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION OF CAST IRON INOCULANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELKEM ASA Drammensveien 169 0277 Oslo / NO | [2022/09] |
Former [2020/45] | For all designated states ELKEM ASA Drammensveien 169 0277 Oslo / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OTT, Emmanuelle Gullkroken 1 B 0377 OSLO / NO | [2020/45] | Representative(s) | Zacco Norway AS P.O. Box 488 Skøyen 0213 Oslo / NO | [N/P] |
Former [2022/09] | Zacco Norway AS P.O. Box 2003 Vika 0125 Oslo / NO | ||
Former [2020/45] | Zacco Norway AS P.O. Box 2003 Vika 0125 Oslo / NO | Application number, filing date | 18845380.7 | 21.12.2018 | [2020/45] | WO2018NO50327 | Priority number, date | NO20170002064 | 29.12.2017 Original published format: NO 20172064 | [2020/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019132671 | Date: | 04.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3732308 | Date: | 04.11.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3732308 | Date: | 02.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C21C1/10, C22C38/00, C22C38/02, C22C38/06, C22C38/14, C22C38/60, B22D1/00, C22C37/04, C22C38/04, C22C33/08 | [2021/37] | CPC: |
C21C1/105 (EP,KR,US);
C21C1/10 (NO);
B22D1/007 (EP,KR);
C21C7/0075 (KR);
C22C33/08 (EP,NO,US);
C22C37/04 (EP,KR);
C22C37/10 (KR);
C22C38/002 (EP);
C22C38/005 (EP,KR);
C22C38/02 (EP,KR);
C22C38/04 (EP,KR);
C22C38/06 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2020/45] | C21C1/10, C22C33/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/45] | Extension states | BA | 18.09.2020 | Validation states | KH | 18.09.2020 | MA | 15.07.2020 | TN | 15.07.2020 | Title | German: | GUSSEISENIMPFMITTEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES GUSSEISENIMPFMITTELS | [2020/45] | English: | CAST IRON INOCULANT AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION OF CAST IRON INOCULANT | [2020/45] | French: | INOCULANT DE FONTE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'INOCULANT DE FONTE | [2020/45] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.08.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/45] | 15.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.01.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 02.03.2022 | CY | 02.03.2022 | MC | 02.03.2022 | MK | 02.03.2022 | MT | 02.03.2022 | SM | 02.03.2022 | GR | 03.06.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/29] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
CY | 02.03.2022 | ||
MC | 02.03.2022 | ||
MK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
CY | 02.03.2022 | ||
MK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
CY | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | SM | 02.03.2022 | |
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/37] | GR | 03.06.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS5943843 (KUSAKA REAMETARU KENKYUSHO KK) [A] 1-23 * abstract *; | [ID]WO9929911 (ELKEM MATERIALS [NO]) [ID] 1-3,5,18,21 * page 4, line 10 - page 5, line 10 * * claim 2 *; | [A]CN102002548 (HARBIN INST OF TECHNOLOGY) [A] 1-23 * abstract *; | [A]US2015284830 (FAY AURELIE [FR], et al) [A] 1-21 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0036] *; | [A] - S V Subramanian ET AL, "RESEARCH PROJECT NO. 27 RARE EARTHS IN DUCTILE IRON PRODUCTION: A CRITICAL REVIEW by DUCTILE IRON SOCIETY Issued by the Ductile Iron Society for the use of its Member Companies -Not for General Distribution", (19960101), URL: https://www.ductile.org/wp-content/uploads/researchactivity/restrictedpdfs/doc27.pdf, XP055579541 [A] 1-23 * the whole document * * See Chapter 2 * | by applicant | US4432793 | WO9524508 | US5733502 | WO9929911 | US2015284830 | US2016047008 |