EP3670654 - XYLANASE MUTANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qingdao Vland Biotech Group Co. Ltd. Room 12A07 Shandong Expressway Mansion No. 29 Miaoling Road Laoshan District Qingdao, Shandong 266061 / CN | [2020/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Xiuxiu Room 302 Buiding 4 Hi-tech Industry Park 1 No.151 Zhuzhou Road Laoshan District Qingdao Shandong 266101 / CN | 02 /
SHAO, Chao Room 302 Buiding 4 Hi-tech Industry Park 1 No.151 Zhuzhou Road Laoshan District Qingdao Shandong 266101 / CN | 03 /
HUANG, Yijun Room 302 Buiding 4 Hi-tech Industry Park 1 No.151 Zhuzhou Road Laoshan District Qingdao Shandong 266101 / CN | [2020/26] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2020/26] | Application number, filing date | 18845993.7 | 19.04.2018 | [2020/26] | WO2018CN83635 | Priority number, date | CN201710712383 | 18.08.2017 Original published format: CN201710712383 | [2020/26] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019033775 | Date: | 21.02.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3670654 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.02.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/42, C12N15/56, C12N15/81, C12N1/19, C12R1/84 | [2020/26] | CPC: |
C12N15/815 (EP,CN,US);
C12N9/2482 (CN,US);
C12N9/2402 (EP);
C12Y302/01008 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/26] | Title | German: | XYLANASE-MUTANTE | [2020/26] | English: | XYLANASE MUTANT | [2020/26] | French: | MUTANT DE XYLANASE | [2020/26] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2020 | Translation filed | 10.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 10.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/26] | 05.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US7060482 (SUNG WING L [CA], et al); | International search | [A]CN102757947 (WUHAN SUNHY BIOLOG CO LTD) [A] 1-10; | [A]CN104630183 (UNIV CHINA AGRICULTURAL) [A] 1-10; | [A]WO9424270 (CA NAT RESEARCH COUNCIL [CA], et al) [A] 1-10; | [A]CN104911163 (VLAND BIOTECH GROUP CO LTD) [A] 1-10 |