EP3549678 - SLOT DIE COATER FOR CHANGING COATING FORM OF ELECTRODE ACTIVE MATERIAL SLURRY THROUGH MOVEMENT OF SLOTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.02.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Energy Solution, Ltd. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | [2022/13] |
Former [2022/03] | For all designated states LG Energy Solution Ltd. Tower 1, 108 Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu 07335 Seoul / KR | ||
Former [2019/41] | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Do-Hyun LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon34122 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Taek-Soo LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Cheol-Woo LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
CHOY, Sang-Hoon LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2019/41] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/13] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2019/41] | Cabinet Plasseraud 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 18846292.3 | 29.06.2018 | [2019/41] | WO2018KR07422 | Priority number, date | KR20170104380 | 17.08.2017 Original published format: KR 20170104380 | KR20180074840 | 28.06.2018 Original published format: KR 20180074840 | [2019/41] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019035553 | Date: | 21.02.2019 | Language: | KO | [2019/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3549678 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3549678 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 21.02.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B05C5/02, B05B1/04, H01M4/04 | [2019/41] | CPC: |
B05C5/0262 (EP,US);
B05C5/0283 (KR,US);
B05B1/04 (EP,US);
B05B1/044 (KR,US);
H01M4/04 (EP);
H01M4/0404 (KR,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHLITZDÜSENBESCHICHTER ZUM ÄNDERN DER BESCHICHTUNGSFORM EINER ELEKTRODENAKTIVMATERIALAUFSCHLÄMMUNG DURCH BEWEGUNG DER SCHLITZE | [2019/41] | English: | SLOT DIE COATER FOR CHANGING COATING FORM OF ELECTRODE ACTIVE MATERIAL SLURRY THROUGH MOVEMENT OF SLOTS | [2019/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ENDUCTION À FILIÈRE À FENTE POUR CHANGER LA FORME D'ENDUCTION D'UNE SUSPENSION DE MATÉRIAU ACTIF D'ÉLECTRODE PAR LE DÉPLACEMENT DE FENTES | [2019/41] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2019 | Translation filed | 05.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 05.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/41] | 06.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.01.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.06.2018 | AL | 30.03.2022 | AT | 30.03.2022 | CY | 30.03.2022 | CZ | 30.03.2022 | DK | 30.03.2022 | EE | 30.03.2022 | ES | 30.03.2022 | FI | 30.03.2022 | HR | 30.03.2022 | LT | 30.03.2022 | LV | 30.03.2022 | MC | 30.03.2022 | MK | 30.03.2022 | RO | 30.03.2022 | RS | 30.03.2022 | SE | 30.03.2022 | SI | 30.03.2022 | SK | 30.03.2022 | SM | 30.03.2022 | TR | 30.03.2022 | IE | 29.06.2022 | LU | 29.06.2022 | BE | 30.06.2022 | BG | 30.06.2022 | CH | 30.06.2022 | LI | 30.06.2022 | NO | 30.06.2022 | GR | 01.07.2022 | IS | 30.07.2022 | PT | 01.08.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 29.06.2018 | |
AL | 30.03.2022 | ||
AT | 30.03.2022 | ||
CY | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
MC | 30.03.2022 | ||
MK | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SI | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
IE | 29.06.2022 | ||
LU | 29.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 29.06.2018 | |
AL | 30.03.2022 | ||
AT | 30.03.2022 | ||
CY | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
MC | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SI | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
IE | 29.06.2022 | ||
LU | 29.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 29.06.2018 | |
AL | 30.03.2022 | ||
AT | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
MC | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SI | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
IE | 29.06.2022 | ||
LU | 29.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
AT | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
MC | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SI | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
IE | 29.06.2022 | ||
LU | 29.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
AT | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
MC | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
IE | 29.06.2022 | ||
LU | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
AT | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
MC | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
IE | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
AT | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
MC | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
AT | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
AT | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 30.03.2022 | |
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 30.03.2022 | |
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 30.03.2022 | |
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 30.03.2022 | |
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | FI | 30.03.2022 | |
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | HR | 30.03.2022 | |
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 30.03.2022 | |
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 30.03.2022 | |
NO | 30.06.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5922408 (NAKAMA YUTAKA [JP], et al) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * column 5, line 13 - line 25 * [A] 7-9; | [XAY]JP2003112101 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND) [X] 1-5,7,9 * abstract * * paragraph [0024] * [A] 8 [Y] 6; | [Y]US2011287171 (SEO WON-SUB [KR], et al) [Y] 6 * abstract ** paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0051] * | International search | [XA]JPH09276770 (KAO CORP) [X] 1-6 [A] 7-9; | [A]JP2000117175 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-9; | [A]JP2003112101 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND) [A] 1-9; | [A]KR20110128589 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-9; | [A]KR200406129Y [A] 1-9 | by applicant | KR20170104380 | KR20180074840 |