EP3603987 - THERMAL TRANSFER SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd. 1-1, Ichigaya-kaga-cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | [2020/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IMAKURA Yuzu c/o Dai Nippon Printing Co. Ltd. 1-1 Ichigaya-kaga-cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | 02 /
HIROKAWA Junko c/o Dai Nippon Printing Co. Ltd. 1-1 Ichigaya-kaga-cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | [2020/06] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2020/06] | Application number, filing date | 18847786.3 | 28.02.2018 | [2020/06] | WO2018JP07551 | Priority number, date | JP20170161225 | 24.08.2017 Original published format: JP 2017161225 | [2020/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019038960 | Date: | 28.02.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3603987 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3603987 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.02.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/42, B41M5/385, B41M5/44, B41M5/382 | [2021/02] | CPC: |
B41M5/423 (EP);
B41M5/44 (EP,US);
B32B27/30 (US);
B32B27/306 (US);
B41M5/382 (EP);
B41M5/426 (EP);
B32B2250/04 (US);
B41M2205/06 (EP,US);
B41M2205/30 (EP,US);
B41M2205/38 (EP,US);
B41M5/42 (EP);
Y10T428/24893 (US);
Y10T428/24942 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/06] | B41M5/42, B41M5/385, B41M5/44 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄRMEÜBERTRAGUNGSFOLIE | [2020/06] | English: | THERMAL TRANSFER SHEET | [2020/06] | French: | FEUILLE DE TRANSFERT THERMIQUE | [2020/06] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2019 | Translation filed | 24.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 24.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 13.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 20.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.08.2023 | CZ | 30.08.2023 | DK | 30.08.2023 | EE | 30.08.2023 | ES | 30.08.2023 | FI | 30.08.2023 | HR | 30.08.2023 | IT | 30.08.2023 | LT | 30.08.2023 | LV | 30.08.2023 | MC | 30.08.2023 | NL | 30.08.2023 | PL | 30.08.2023 | RO | 30.08.2023 | RS | 30.08.2023 | SE | 30.08.2023 | SI | 30.08.2023 | SK | 30.08.2023 | SM | 30.08.2023 | NO | 30.11.2023 | GR | 01.12.2023 | IS | 30.12.2023 | PT | 02.01.2024 | [2024/45] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
IT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SI | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
IT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 30.08.2023 | |
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS63281890 (RICOH KK) [Y] 1-14 * examples 1-3 * * figure 1 *; | [A]JPS63283986 (RICOH KK) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH11321136 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [A]JP2002166657 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP1958787 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-14 * paragraphs [0015] , [0018] , [0026] , [0031] * * claim 5 *; | [Y]WO2017029859 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-14 * example 1 * * paragraphs [0060] , [0061] * | International search | [X]JPS63281890 (RICOH KK) [X] 1-14 * , *; | [X]JPH0334894 (TOYO INK MFG CO) [X] 1-14 * , *; | [A]JPH09323480 (SONY CHEMICALS) [A] 8-9 * , [001S *; | [X]US5985422 (KRAUTER HEINRICH [CH]) [X] 1-14 * , & US 6358597 B1 & US 6376056 B1 & EP 823332 A1 & DE 19632111 C & DE 59700240 C & CA 2212480 A1 *; | [A]JP2001219654 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 8-9* , [0028]- *; | [X]JP2001232955 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1-14 * , *; | [X]JP2001322360 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1, 3-14 * , [0033] *; | [A]JP2002113961 (RICOH KK) [A] 6, 13-14 * , *; | [A]JP2004284155 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [A] 3 * , *; | [A]JP2015091647 (EISAI R&D MAN CO LTD) [A] 3 * , * | by applicant | JPH082719B | JP3153024U |