Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP3674458 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3674458



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 403
24.03.2025 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
24.03.2025 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
28.08.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.08.2024 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
28.08.2024 Claims Search / examination 2
28.08.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.08.2024 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
02.07.2024 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
27.06.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.06.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.06.2024 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.03.2024 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
01.03.2024 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
24.10.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.10.2023 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
24.10.2023 Claims Search / examination 2
24.10.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.10.2023 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
15.06.2023 Annex to a communication Search / examination 5
15.06.2023 Annex to a communication Search / examination 57
15.06.2023 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
15.06.2023 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
05.06.2023 Examination started Search / examination 1
18.05.2022 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
13.05.2022 Annexes in respect of a client data request Search / examination 10
13.05.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.05.2022 Submission concerning change of applicant's address Search / examination 2
09.12.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.12.2021 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
09.12.2021 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
09.12.2021 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
09.12.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
31.05.2021 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
11.05.2021 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
11.05.2021 Document annexed to the Extended European Search Report Search / examination 57
11.05.2021 European search opinion Search / examination 5
11.05.2021 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
11.05.2021 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
15.04.2021 Search started Search / examination 1
04.06.2020 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
04.06.2020 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
27.03.2020 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.03.2020 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
10.03.2020 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 4
10.03.2020 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
06.03.2020 Communication concerning corrected entries of the applicant Search / examination 1
19.02.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
19.02.2020 Abstract Search / examination 1
19.02.2020 Claims Search / examination 2
19.02.2020 Description Search / examination 54
19.02.2020 Drawings Search / examination 2
19.02.2020 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
19.02.2020 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
08.01.2020 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
19.03.2019 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 32
19.03.2019 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 30
28.02.2019 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
28.02.2019 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
28.02.2019 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 47