blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3674458

EP3674458 - FABRIC FOR AIRBAG, COATED FABRIC FOR AIRBAG, AND AIRBAG USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.06.2023
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  29.05.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  02.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.03.2025New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TOYOBO CO., LTD.
13-1, Umeda 1-chome
Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2022/25]For all designated states
TOYOBO CO., LTD.
13-1, Umeda 1-chome
Kita-ku
Osaka-shi
Osaka 5300001 / JP
Former [2020/27]For all designated states
TOYOBO CO., LTD.
2-8 Dojima Hama 2-Chome
Kita-ku
Osaka-shi
Osaka 530-8230 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KAMIMURA, Ryuji
c/o TOYOBO CO. LTD.
1-1 Katata 2-chome
Otsu-shi Shiga 520-0292 / JP
02 / AKECHI, Tsutomu
c/o TOYOBO CO. LTD.
1-1 Katata 2-chome
Otsu-shi Shiga 520-0292 / JP
 [2020/27]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[2020/27]
Application number, filing date18848067.717.08.2018
[2020/27]
WO2018JP30500
Priority number, dateJP2017015871621.08.2017         Original published format: JP 2017158716
JP2018006426029.03.2018         Original published format: JP 2018064260
[2020/27]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2019039396
Date:28.02.2019
Language:JA
[2019/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3674458
Date:01.07.2020
Language:EN
[2020/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP28.02.2019
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.05.2021
ClassificationIPC:D03D1/02, B60R21/235, D06M10/00, D06M15/643
[2020/27]
CPC:
D03D1/02 (EP,US); B60R21/235 (EP,US); D06M10/00 (EP);
D06M10/04 (US); D06M15/643 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/27]
TitleGerman:GEWEBE FÜR AIRBAG, BESCHICHTETES GEWEBE FÜR AIRBAG UND AIRBAG MIT VERWENDUNG DAVON[2020/27]
English:FABRIC FOR AIRBAG, COATED FABRIC FOR AIRBAG, AND AIRBAG USING SAME[2020/27]
French:TISSU POUR COUSSIN DE SÉCURITÉ GONFLABLE AINSI QUE TISSU REVÊTU POUR COUSSIN DE SÉCURITÉ GONFLABLE, ET COUSSIN DE SÉCURITÉ GONFLABLE METTANT EN OEUVRE CEUX-CI[2020/27]
Entry into regional phase19.02.2020Translation filed 
27.02.2020National basic fee paid 
27.02.2020Search fee paid 
27.02.2020Designation fee(s) paid 
27.02.2020Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.02.2020Examination requested  [2020/27]
09.12.2021Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.06.2023Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.10.2023Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.03.2024Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.08.2024Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.2025Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.08.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
06.08.2021Renewal fee patent year 04
17.08.2022Renewal fee patent year 05
24.08.2023Renewal fee patent year 06
28.08.2024Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[I]EP0436950  (AKZO NV [NL]);
 [I]EP2256237  (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP])
International search[A]JP2005138704  (NIHON PLAST CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * , claims 1, 3, 5, examples 1, 2, paragraph [0001] (Family: none) *;
 [A]WO2009084334  (TOYO BOSEKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * , example 1, table 1 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2010106375  (SEIREN CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * , claims 1, 2, examples 1-3, paragraph [0017] (Family: none) *;
 [A]WO2011055562  (ASAHI KASEI FIBERS CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-10* , claim 1, paragraph [0017] & US 2012/0225229 A1, claim 1, paragraph [0039] & EP 2500453 A1 & CN 102471954 A & KR 10-2012-0032031 A *;
 [A]WO2013084326  (ASAHI KASEI FIBERS CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * , claims 1, 4, 5, paragraph [0010] & US 2014/0302263 Al, claims 1, 4, 5, paragraph [0010] & EP 2789715 A1 & KR 10-2014-0064993 A & CN 103906867 A & MX 2014005031 A & KR 10-2016-0145196 A *
ExaminationCN103669015
by applicantJP2011202340
 JP2013189744
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.