EP3738601 - CYTOCIDAL AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujita Academy 1-98 Dengakugakubo Kutsukake-cho Toyoake-shi, Aichi 470-1192 / JP | [2020/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUGIHARA Kazuhiro c/o National University Corporation Hamamatsu University School of Medicine 20-1 Handayama 1-chome Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 431-3192 / JP | 02 /
KANAYAMA Naohiro c/o National University Corporation Hamamatsu University School of Medicine 20-1 Handayama 1-chome Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 431-3192 / JP | 03 /
ONODERA Yuichiro c/o National University Corporation Hamamatsu University School of Medicine 20-1 Handayama 1-chome Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 431-3192 / JP | 04 /
SHIBATA Toshiaki c/o National University Corporation Hamamatsu University School of Medicine 20-1 Handayama 1-chome Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 431-3192 / JP | 05 /
FUKUDA Michiko c/o NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF ADVANCED INDUSTRIAL SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY Tsukuba Central 1 1-1 Umezono 1-chome Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-8560 / JP | 06 /
NONAKA Motohiro c/o NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF ADVANCED INDUSTRIAL SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY Tsukuba Central 1 1-1 Umezono 1-chome Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-8560 / JP | [2020/47] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Becker et Associés 25, rue Louis le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | [2020/47] | Application number, filing date | 18848077.6 | 23.08.2018 | [2020/47] | WO2018JP31136 | Priority number, date | JP20170161556 | 24.08.2017 Original published format: JP 2017161556 | [2020/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019039540 | Date: | 28.02.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3738601 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.02.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/10, A01K67/027, A61K47/66, A61P15/00, A61P35/00, A61P43/00, C07K7/08, C07K19/00 | [2020/47] | CPC: |
A61K38/10 (EP,KR,US);
A01K67/027 (EP,KR);
A61K47/66 (KR,US);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/02 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
G01N33/6893 (KR,US);
C07K19/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/47] | Title | German: | ZELLZERSTÖRENDES MITTEL | [2020/47] | English: | CYTOCIDAL AGENT | [2020/47] | French: | AGENT CYTOCIDE | [2020/47] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2020 | Translation filed | 25.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2020 | Search fee paid | 25.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 25.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/47] | 17.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2007076501 (BURNHAM INST MEDICAL RESEARCH [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1, line 10 - page 33, line 14 * * example - * * claim - * * sequence 1 *; | [XYI]WO2011027312 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 15 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 123, line 15 * * example - * * claim - * [Y] 15 [I] 15; | [Y]WO2011079304 (SANFORD BURNHAM MED RES INST [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 4 - page 66, paragraph 2 * * example - * * claim - ** sequence 2 *; | [XYI]WO2014201118 (SANFORD BURNHAM MED RES INST [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1, line 12 - page 55, line 18 * * example - * * claim - * * sequences 1-4 * [Y] 1-15 [I] 1-15; | [XYI] - S. HATAKEYAMA ET AL, "Targeted drug delivery to tumor vasculature by a carbohydrate mimetic peptide", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (20111206), vol. 108, no. 49, doi:10.1073/pnas.1105057108, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 19587 - 19592, XP055040103 [X] 1-9 * abstract * * page 19587, column l, paragraph 1 - page 19591, column r, paragraph 3 * [Y] 1-9 [I] 1-9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1105057108 | [XYI] - K. SUGIHARA ET AL, "Development of pro-apoptotic peptides as potential therapy for peritoneal endometriosis", NATURE COMMUNICATIONS, GB, (20140622), vol. 5, doi:10.1038/ncomms5478, ISSN 2041-1723, XP055255332 [X] 1-9 * abstract * * page 2, column l, paragraph 1 - page 8, column r, paragraph 4 * [Y] 1-9 [I] 1-9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ncomms5478 | International search | [Y]JP2013523824 [Y] 11-17 * , *; | [Y]WO2015041019 (UNIV KYOTO [JP], et al) [Y] 10 * , *; | [XY]US2016145308 (FUKUDA MICHIKO [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * , 3, 4, 6, 8, 5, 6 1, 77, 93, 109, 125, 141,157, 0041, 0 051, 0140, 0153, 0154, 0159, 0184, 0 191, 0220, 0263, 3 * [Y] 5, 8-17; | [Y] - SUGIHARA, Kazuhiro et al, "Search of peptide therapeutic drugs for endometriosis", Programs and abstracts of the 32nd Annual Meeting of the Japan Society of Drug Delivery System, (20160000), page 170, XP009519434 [Y] 8, 9 | [Y] - SHIBATA, Toshiaki et al, "P3-14-1 Anti-tumor drugs using peptide that mimics sugar chains", Acta Obstetrica et Gynaecologica Japonica, (20160000), vol. 68, no. 2, ISSN 0300-9165, page 858, XP009519433 [Y] 5 | [A] - SUGIHARA, K. et al., "Development of pro-apoptotic peptides as potential therapy for peritoneal endometriosis", NATURE COMMUNICATIONS, (20140000), vol. 5, no. 4478, doi:10.1038/ncomms5478, ISSN 2041-1723, pages 1 - 9, XP055255332 [A] 1-17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ncomms5478 | by applicant | US2016145308 | JP2017161556 | - SUGIHARA et al., NATURE COMMUNICATIONS, (20140000), vol. 5 |