EP3672665 - EXOSTRUCTURE TO ASSIST IN ACCURATE SYRINGE INJECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KB Medical, LLC 977 Crazyhorse Way Las Vegas, Nevada 89110 / US | [2020/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KWOLEK, Marilyn 917 San Ramon Valley Boulevard Suite 199 Danville, California 94526 / US | 02 /
BLOCK, Jon 2210 Jackson Street 410 San Francisco, California 94115 / US | [2020/27] | Representative(s) | Clark, Jane Anne, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2024/24] |
Former [2020/27] | Clark, Jane Anne, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 18848285.5 | 26.07.2018 | [2020/27] | WO2018US43956 | Priority number, date | US201762548640P | 22.08.2017 Original published format: US 201762548640 P | US201816035408 | 13.07.2018 Original published format: US201816035408 | [2020/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019040228 | Date: | 28.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3672665 | Date: | 01.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3672665 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.02.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/20, A61M5/24, A61M5/28, A61M5/30, A61M5/31, A61M5/315 | [2020/27] | CPC: |
A61M5/3137 (EP,KR,US);
A61M5/3158 (EP,KR,US);
A61M5/31515 (EP,KR,US);
A61M5/31573 (EP,KR);
A61M5/31593 (KR,US);
A61M5/31595 (EP);
A61M5/502 (EP,KR);
A61M2205/273 (EP,KR);
A61M2205/581 (EP,KR,US);
A61M2205/582 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EXOSTRUKTUR ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG DER GENAUEN SPRITZENINJEKTION | [2020/27] | English: | EXOSTRUCTURE TO ASSIST IN ACCURATE SYRINGE INJECTION | [2020/27] | French: | EXOSTRUCTURE D'ASSISTANCE POUR INJECTION PRÉCISE AVEC UNE SERINGUE | [2020/27] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2020 | Search fee paid | 25.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/27] | 28.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24174988.6 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4865591 (SAMS BERNARD [GB]); | [YA]US2015025502 (SPENSER BENJAMIN [IL], et al); | [YA]DE202016100531U (H & B ELECTRONIC GMBH & CO KG [DE]) | International search | [A]US4022207 (CITRIN PAUL S); | [A]US4865591 (SAMS BERNARD [GB]); | [A]US2004019333 (GRAF RONEY [CH], et al); | [A]US6699224 (KIRCHHOFER FRITZ [CH], et al) | by applicant | US2491978 | US4022207 | US4415101 | US4865591 | US2015025502 | DE202016100531U |