EP3673533 - APPARATUS WITH RECTANGULAR WAVEGUIDE TO RADIAL MODE TRANSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2022 [2022/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kymeta Corporation 12277 134th Court NE Suite 100 Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | [2020/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIKES, Benjamin 12277 134th Court NE Suite 100 Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 02 /
SLOTA, Mike 12277 134th Court NE Suite 100 Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 03 /
GUENTERBERG, Anthony 12277 134th CourtNE Suite 100 Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 04 /
SAZEGAR, Mohsen 12277 134th Court NE Suite 100 Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 05 /
EYLANDER, Chris 12277 134th Court NE Suite 100 Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 06 /
EYLANDER, Bradley 12277 134th Court NE Suite 100 Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | [2020/27] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2020/27] | Application number, filing date | 18848745.8 | 21.08.2018 | [2020/27] | WO2018US47385 | Priority number, date | US201762548275P | 21.08.2017 Original published format: US 201762548275 P | US201815999703 | 20.08.2018 Original published format: US201815999703 | [2020/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019040530 | Date: | 28.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3673533 | Date: | 01.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.02.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01P5/08, H01P5/103, H01P5/107, H01P1/04, H01Q21/00, H01Q21/06, H01Q9/04 | [2021/17] | CPC: |
H01Q21/0012 (EP,US);
H01P1/045 (EP);
H01P5/082 (EP,US);
H01P5/103 (EP,US);
H01P5/107 (EP);
H01Q1/48 (US);
H01Q13/103 (US);
H01Q21/0031 (EP,US);
H01Q21/005 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/27] | H01P3/06, H01P5/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/27] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG MIT ÜBERGANG VON RECHTECKIGEM WELLENLEITER ZU RADIALEM MODUS | [2020/27] | English: | APPARATUS WITH RECTANGULAR WAVEGUIDE TO RADIAL MODE TRANSITION | [2020/27] | French: | APPAREIL AVEC TRANSITION DE GUIDE D'ONDES RECTANGULAIRE AU MODE RADIAL | [2020/27] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2020 | Search fee paid | 19.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/27] | 26.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/14] | 16.11.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2021 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3478282 (SMITH CHARLES ARTHUR) [Y] 10-15 * column 1, line 26 - column 3, line 32 ** figures 1-3 *; | [X]US4590446 (HSU TING-IH [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * figures 1, 2 * * column 3, line 3 - column 4, line 34 *; | [X]JPH0897628 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 9 * paragraphs [0018] - [0027] * * figures 1-3 *; | [XY]US5661498 (GOTO NAOHISA [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * column 2, line 60 - column 4, line 16 * * figures 1, 2, 4 * [Y] 10-15 | International search | [Y]US4590446 (HSU TING-IH [US], et al) [Y] 1-3, 6-16, 19-23, 25 * See claim 7. *; | [A]JP2011508492 (THALES) [A] 1-25 * See paragraphs [0051]-[0055] and figure 3B. *; | [A]US2015022287 (JANNOTTA LOUIS J [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * See claims 1, 15, 18 and figure 1. *; | [YA]US2015380814 (BOUTAYEB HALIM [CA], et al) [Y] 1-3, 6-16, 19-23, 25 * See paragraphs [0033]-[0034], claim 1 and figures 3-4. * [A] 4-5, 17, 18, 24; | [A]US2016156325 (BOUTAYEB HALIM [CA], et al) [A] 1-25* See paragraphs [0041]-[0059] and figures 2-4. * |