EP3496678 - URETHRAL PLUG AND SYSTEM FOR ADDRESSING URINARY INCONTINENCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Life360 Innovations Inc. 2900-550 Burrard Street Vancouver, BC V6C 0A3 / CA | [2019/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUNZ, Kenneth c/o Life360 Innovations Inc. 2900-550 Burrard Street Vancouver, BC V6C 0A3 / CA | 02 /
ORR, Robert, Mitchell c/o Life360 Innovations Inc. 2900-550 Burrard Street Vancouver, BC V6C 0A3 / CA | 03 /
BELLAIRE, Thom c/o Life360 Innovations Inc. 2900-550- Burrard Street Vancouver, BC V6C 0A3 / CA | 04 /
HALSTED, Nigel c/o Life360 Innovations Inc. 2900-550 Burrard Street Vancouver, BC 06C 0A3 / CA | 05 /
JANZEN, Ernie c/o Life360 Innovations Inc. 2900-550 Burrard Street Vancouver, BC V6C 0A3 / CA | [2019/25] | Representative(s) | Patentwerk B.V. P.O. Box 1514 5200 BN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | [2019/25] | Application number, filing date | 18849072.6 | 22.08.2018 | [2019/25] | WO2018IB01053 | Priority number, date | US201715683124 | 22.08.2017 Original published format: US201715683124 | [2019/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019038593 | Date: | 28.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3496678 | Date: | 19.06.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 28.02.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/00 | [2019/40] | CPC: |
A61F2/0009 (EP,US);
A61F2210/0071 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0067 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0091 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0093 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0039 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/25] | A61F5/48, A61F2/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/25] | Title | German: | HARNRÖHRENSTECKER UND SYSTEM ZUR ADRESSIERUNG VON HARNINKONTINENZ | [2019/25] | English: | URETHRAL PLUG AND SYSTEM FOR ADDRESSING URINARY INCONTINENCE | [2019/25] | French: | BOUCHON URÉTRAL ET SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT DE L'INCONTINENCE URINAIRE | [2019/25] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 15.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/25] | 19.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/29] | 22.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2023 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5513659 (BUUCK ROBERT E [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,5-7,9* abstract *; | [Y]US5924423 (MAJLESSI HESHMAT [US]) [Y] 2,8 * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 29 * * column 2, line 56 - line 61 * * figure 1 *; | [IY]US2011028778 (KUNZ KENNETH [CA]) [I] 1-3,6-11,13 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0055] * * figures 1-9 * [Y] 1-11,13; | [Y]WO2015179323 (FLOELLE INC [US]) [Y] 1,3-7,9-11,13 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0043] * * figures 1A-8 * | International search | [A]US5509427 (SIMON JOHN G [US], et al) [A] 1-21*The entire document*; | [A]US5513659 (BUUCK ROBERT E [US], et al) [A] 1-21 *The entire document*; | [A]US5671755 (SIMON JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1-21 *The entire document*; | [A]US2011028778 (KUNZ KENNETH [CA]) [A] 1-21 *The entire document* | by applicant | US5513659 | US5924423 | US2011028778 | WO2015179323 |