EP3673836 - TOOL FOR TREATING EXCISED END OF BODY ORGAN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jichi Medical University 2-6-3 Hirakawa-cho Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 102-0093 / JP | [2020/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANEDA Yuji c/o Jichi Medical University 3311-1 Yakushiji Shimotsuke-shi Tochigi 329-0498 / JP | [2020/27] | Representative(s) | Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/27] | Allain, Laurent, et al Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | Application number, filing date | 18849290.4 | 24.08.2018 | [2020/27] | WO2018JP31328 | Priority number, date | JP20170161201 | 24.08.2017 Original published format: JP 2017161201 | [2020/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019039586 | Date: | 28.02.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3673836 | Date: | 01.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.02.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/12 | [2020/27] | CPC: |
A61B17/12009 (EP,KR,US);
A61B17/08 (KR);
A61L31/148 (KR);
A61B17/1322 (EP);
A61B17/1327 (EP);
A61B2017/00004 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/27] | Title | German: | WERKZEUG ZUR BEHANDLUNG DES EXZISIERTEN ENDES EINES KÖRPERORGANS | [2020/27] | English: | TOOL FOR TREATING EXCISED END OF BODY ORGAN | [2020/27] | French: | OUTIL POUR TRAITER UNE EXTRÉMITÉ EXCISÉE D'UN ORGANE CORPOREL | [2020/27] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2020 | Translation filed | 09.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 09.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/27] | 10.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2023 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 21.09.2023 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 31.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5203786 (VERNICK JEROME J [US]); | [XI]US2004032332 (SCHIEBLER MARK [US]); | [XI]US2006264987 (SGRO JEAN-CLAUDE [FR]); | [XI]US2014012293 (BERTOLERO ARTHUR A [US], et al); | [XI]EP3146917 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY LLC [PR]) | International search | [A]JPS57150605U ; | [A]JPH05337123 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | [A]JP2004298501 (KOIKE HIROSHI); | [A]JP2006087671 (UNIV KOBE, et al) | by applicant | JP2004298501 | JP2015523144 |