EP3676352 - VACUUM FILTRATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/28] | METHODS, DEVICES, AND SYSTEMS FOR PROCESSING AND FILTERING CARBONACEOUS COMPOSITIONS | ||
[2023/40] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LT, NO | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nanotech Energy, Inc. 323 Sunny Isles Blvd., 7th Floor Sunny Isles Beach, FL 33160 / US | [2024/13] |
Former [2020/28] | For all designated states Nanotech Energy, Inc. 12100 Wilshire Blvd. Suite 800 Los Angeles, California 90025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAINE, Scott 12100 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 800 Los Angeles, California 90025 / US | [2020/28] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2024/07] |
Former [2020/28] | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 18849599.8 | 29.08.2018 | [2020/28] | WO2018US48602 | Priority number, date | US201762552250P | 30.08.2017 Original published format: US 201762552250 P | [2020/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019046462 | Date: | 07.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3676352 | Date: | 08.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3676352 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C10G1/00 | [2020/28] | CPC: |
C01B32/198 (EP,KR,US);
B01D29/88 (KR,US);
B01D29/60 (KR,US);
B01D29/90 (KR,US);
C01B32/196 (KR,US);
B01D2201/204 (KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VAKUUM-FILTERSYSTEM | [2023/40] | English: | VACUUM FILTRATION SYSTEM | [2023/40] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FILTRATION SOUS VIDE | [2023/40] |
Former [2020/28] | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNGEN UND SYSTEME ZUR VERARBEITUNG UND FILTERUNG VON KOHLENSTOFFHALTIGEN ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | ||
Former [2020/28] | METHODS, DEVICES, AND SYSTEMS FOR PROCESSING AND FILTERING CARBONACEOUS COMPOSITIONS | ||
Former [2020/28] | PROCÉDÉS, DISPOSITIFS ET SYSTÈMES POUR LE TRAITEMENT ET LA FILTRATION DE COMPOSITIONS CARBONÉES | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 09.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/28] | 16.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2020 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   08.10.2020 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LT | 14.02.2024 | NO | 14.05.2024 | IS | 14.06.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/32] | IS | 14.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4443421 (HOLLIFIELD CHARLES M [US], et al); | [A]US4707260 (NAGAYAMA TAKASHI [JP], et al); | [A]US5000850 (BERRY HAROLD B [US]); | [A]US2012055887 (LOVE JOHNNY LEON [US]); | [A]US2015008194 (DAVIS WILLIAM E [US], et al); | [XP]WO2017147468 (NANOTECH ENERGY INC [US]) | International search | [Y]USRE23788E ; | [Y]US3765051 (WANAT C); | [Y]US4909181 (SMITH PETER A [GB]); | [Y]US2003170156 (KEMP MAURICE CLARENCE [US], et al); | [A]US2004112806 (ANDERSON RONALD L [US]); | [A]US2004171321 (PLANT DANIEL JAMES [US]); | [A]US2004238439 (OGLESBY HUGH J [US]); | [Y]US2009071123 (TOMAZIC DEAN [US], et al); | [A]US2009200248 (VAN ROOYEN KENNETH CARL [ZA]); | [XYA]US2012055887 (LOVE JOHNNY LEON [US]); | [A]US2013315815 (LEE SUNGGUK [KR], et al); | [Y]US2014272172 (ZHAMU ARUNA [US], et al); | [Y]WO2016191564 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) | Examination | US4564450 |