EP3553825 - THIN FILM PACKAGING STRUCTURE, THIN FILM PACKAGING METHOD, AND DISPLAY PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Refusal of application | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kunshan Go-Visionox Opto-Electronics Co., Ltd. Building 4 No. 1 Longteng Road Development Zone KunShan City, Jiangsu 215300 / CN | [2019/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Quan No.188 Chenfeng Road New&Hi-Tech Industrial Development Zone Kunshan Jiangsu 215300 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Lu No.188 Chenfeng Road New&Hi-Tech Industrial Development Zone Kunshan Jiangsu 215300 / CN | 03 /
HAN, Zhenzhen No.188 Chenfeng Road New&Hi-Tech Industrial Development Zone Kunshan Jiangsu 215300 / CN | 04 /
HU, Siming No.188 Chenfeng Road New&Hi-Tech Industrial Development Zone Kunshan Jiangsu 215300 / CN | 05 /
ZHU, Hui No.188 Chenfeng Road New&Hi-Tech Industrial Development Zone Kunshan Jiangsu 215300 / CN | [2019/42] | Representative(s) | Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/42] | Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18850337.9 | 28.04.2018 | [2019/42] | WO2018CN85052 | Priority number, date | CN201710772356 | 31.08.2017 Original published format: CN201710772356 | [2019/42] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019041864 | Date: | 07.03.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3553825 | Date: | 16.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/32, H01L51/52 | [2019/42] | CPC: |
H10K59/8731 (EP,CN,KR);
H10K59/122 (CN,KR,US);
H10K50/8445 (US);
H01L25/0655 (KR);
H10K50/8426 (US);
H10K50/844 (US);
H10K59/8722 (EP,CN,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/42] | Title | German: | DÜNNSCHICHT-VERPACKUNGSSTRUKTUR, DÜNNSCHICHT-VERPACKUNGSVERFAHREN UND ANZEIGETAFEL | [2019/42] | English: | THIN FILM PACKAGING STRUCTURE, THIN FILM PACKAGING METHOD, AND DISPLAY PANEL | [2019/42] | French: | STRUCTURE D'ENCAPSULATION DE FILM MINCE, PROCÉDÉ D'ENCAPSULATION DE FILM MINCE ET PANNEAU D'AFFICHAGE | [2019/42] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2019 | Translation filed | 11.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 11.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/42] | 27.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2024 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2024/40] | 14.05.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.05.2024 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 24.05.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2024/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2014118975 (CHEN KUANG-JUNG [TW], et al); | [X]US2014319474 (KIM NAM-JIN [KR], et al); | [X]US2017244063 (FURUIE MASAMITSU [JP]) | International search | [A]CN106816551 (TIANMA MICROELECTRONICS CO LTD, et al); | [X]CN107104124 (JAPAN DISPLAY INC); | [PX]CN107689425 (KUNSHAN GOVISIONOX OPTOELECTRONICS CO LTD) |