EP3677187 - INTRAORAL SENSOR AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING INTRAORAL SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2025 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 28.05.2025 [2025/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | [2020/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIYAGUCHI, Kazuhisa c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1 Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | 02 /
KITAMURA, Shigehiro c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1 Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | [2020/28] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/28] | Application number, filing date | 18850452.6 | 24.08.2018 | [2020/28] | WO2018JP31359 | Priority number, date | JP20170165259 | 30.08.2017 Original published format: JP 2017165259 | [2020/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019044699 | Date: | 07.03.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3677187 | Date: | 08.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3677187 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/14, A61B6/00, G01T1/20 | [2020/28] | CPC: |
G01T1/20185 (EP);
A61B6/512 (KR,US);
A61B6/00 (EP);
A61B6/102 (KR);
A61B6/425 (KR,US);
A61B6/51 (EP);
G01T1/161 (KR,US);
G01T1/20 (KR,US);
G02B6/08 (US);
A61B2562/225 (KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTRAORALER SENSOR UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES INTRAORALEN SENSORS | [2020/28] | English: | INTRAORAL SENSOR AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING INTRAORAL SENSOR | [2020/28] | French: | CAPTEUR INTRA-BUCCAL ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE CAPTEUR INTRA-BUCCAL | [2020/28] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2020 | Translation filed | 27.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2020 | Search fee paid | 27.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/28] | 16.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.09.2023 | BG | 13.09.2023 | CZ | 13.09.2023 | DK | 13.09.2023 | EE | 13.09.2023 | ES | 13.09.2023 | FI | 13.09.2023 | HR | 13.09.2023 | LT | 13.09.2023 | LV | 13.09.2023 | MC | 13.09.2023 | NL | 13.09.2023 | PL | 13.09.2023 | RO | 13.09.2023 | RS | 13.09.2023 | SE | 13.09.2023 | SI | 13.09.2023 | SK | 13.09.2023 | SM | 13.09.2023 | NO | 13.12.2023 | GR | 14.12.2023 | IS | 13.01.2024 | PT | 15.01.2024 | [2025/22] |
Former [2024/51] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
BG | 13.09.2023 | ||
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
DK | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SI | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/49] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
DK | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SI | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
DK | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 13.09.2023 | |
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2013043397 (TOYAMA SHINTARO [JP], et al); | [Y]US2014367578 (ZELLER UWE [DE]) | International search | [A]JPS61225684 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK); | [A]US5434418 (SCHICK DAVID [US]); | [A]JPH08275942 (LORAL FAIRCHILD CORP [US]); | [A]JP2009500814 ; | [A]US2012228512 (VAN ARENDONK ANTON [CA], et al); | [A]US2014023177 (CHEN ADAM [US], et al); | [A]JP2014153074 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK) | by applicant | US9357972 |