EP3633513 - HOME APPLIANCE AND CONTROL METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 07.06.2023 [2023/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2020/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JEON, Seol-hee c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do, 16677 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Hwa-sung c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 16677 / KR | 03 /
YANG, Hee-kyung c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do, 16677 / KR | 04 /
CHUN, Eun-jin c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do, 16677 / KR | 05 /
HWANG, Soon-hoon c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 16677 / KR | 06 /
LEE, Ji-eun c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do, 16677 / KR | 07 /
CHOI, Wung-chul c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do, 16677 / KR | [2020/15] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2020/15] | Application number, filing date | 18850973.1 | 22.08.2018 | [2020/15] | WO2018KR09681 | Priority number, date | KR20170111395 | 31.08.2017 Original published format: KR 20170111395 | [2020/15] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019045358 | Date: | 07.03.2019 | Language: | KO | [2019/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3633513 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/32, G06F3/16, G06F3/02 | [2020/15] | CPC: |
G06F3/167 (EP,KR,US);
G06F11/325 (KR,US);
G10L15/22 (US);
D06F34/04 (US);
D06F34/32 (EP,US);
G06F11/3013 (US);
G06F11/32 (EP);
G06F3/02 (EP,KR);
G08B5/36 (US);
G10L15/08 (US);
G10L15/30 (US);
H05B45/10 (US);
H05B47/12 (US);
D06F2101/00 (EP);
D06F2105/58 (EP);
D06F34/05 (EP);
D06F34/30 (EP);
G10L2015/088 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/15] | Title | German: | HAUSHALTSGERÄT UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2020/15] | English: | HOME APPLIANCE AND CONTROL METHOD THEREFOR | [2020/15] | French: | APPAREIL MÉNAGER ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE ASSOCIÉ | [2020/15] | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2020 | Translation filed | 03.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 03.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/15] | 22.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.05.2023 | 19.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/23] | 29.01.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/23] | 11.05.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2014084413 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [I]US2015382047 (VAN OS MARCEL [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * figures 1-4E * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0095] *; | [I]US2017068423 (NAPOLITANO LIA T [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * figures 1-2, 5A-6Q * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0110] - paragraph [0204] *; | [A]US2017206900 (LEE YO HAN [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-5B, 10 * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0092] * * paragraph [0155] - paragraph [0170] * | International search | [XY]KR20080096239 (JUNG JANG O [KR]) [X] 1-3, 7-15 * See paragraphs [0077]-[0085], [0124]-[0127], [0167]-[0168], [0290], [0296]; and claim 1. * [Y] 4-6; | [Y]KR20060032060 (DAEWOO ELECTRONICS CORP [KR]) [Y] 4-6 * See paragraph [0034]; claim 1; and figures 1, 3. *; | [A]KR20080061901 (YUJIN ROBOT CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * See claims 1-2. *; | [A]KR20140091324 (NAT UNIV HANBAT INDUSTRY [KR]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraph [0022]. *; | [A]KR20050117478 (SECURED COMMUNICATIONS INC [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * See claim 1 and figure 1. * |