EP3676546 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR A PRODUCTION OF SOLIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/28] | SOLID PRODUCTION METHODS, SYSTEMS, AND DEVICES | ||
[2024/24] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.10.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.06.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2024 | Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rebound Technologies, Inc. 5690 East 56th Avenue, Unit F Commerce City, CO 80022 / US | [2020/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOLDFARBMUREN, Russell 3609 North Garfield Street Denver Colorado 80205 / US | 02 /
ERICKSON, Luke 3010 Kearney Street Denver Colorado 80207 / US | 03 /
NELSON, Josh 960 Centennial Drive Bennett Colorado 80102 / US | 04 /
DARRAH, John 2215 Via Luna Winter Park Florida 32789 / US | 05 /
SANCHEZ, Mauricio 579 North Pennsylvania Street Denver Colorado 80203 / US | 06 /
LORD, Chance 770 Glencoe Street Denver Colorado 80220 / US | [2020/28] | Representative(s) | Turp, Sarah Ann WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/28] | Gill, David Alan WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 18851112.5 | 01.09.2018 | [2020/28] | WO2018US49288 | Priority number, date | US201762553738P | 01.09.2017 Original published format: US 201762553738 P | US201816119661 | 31.08.2018 Original published format: US201816119661 | [2020/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019046836 | Date: | 07.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3676546 | Date: | 08.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F25C1/00, F25C1/12, F25C1/14 | [2024/24] | CPC: |
F25C1/12 (EP,US);
F25C1/00 (EP,US);
F25C1/147 (EP,US);
F25D17/02 (EP,US);
F25D3/005 (EP,US);
F25C2300/00 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/22] | F25C1/00, F25C1/12 | ||
Former IPC [2020/28] | F25C1/12, F25C1/00, F25C1/16, F25D31/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/28] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FESTSTOFFEN | [2024/24] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR A PRODUCTION OF SOLIDS | [2024/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE PRODUCTION DE SOLIDES | [2024/24] |
Former [2020/28] | VERFAHREN, SYSTEME UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FESTSTOFFEN | ||
Former [2020/28] | SOLID PRODUCTION METHODS, SYSTEMS, AND DEVICES | ||
Former [2020/28] | PROCÉDÉS, SYSTÈMES ET DISPOSITIFS DE PRODUCTION DE SOLIDE | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 26.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/28] | 29.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US3869870 (KUEHNER RICHARD) [X] 1,3,4,6-8,12 * column 2, lines 14-27; figures 1-3 * [I] 2,5,10,13,14; | [X]US3906742 (NEWTON ALWIN B) [X] 1,3,6,7,12 * column 2, line 20 - column 4, line 43; figure 1 *; | [X]EP0081913 (WYETH JOHN & BROTHER LTD [GB]) [X] 1,3,6,7 * page 7, line 16 - page 11, line 7; figures 1, 2; claim 1 *; | [XI]WO8707250 (BLACKMORE COLLINS ROBERT [AU]) [X] 1,3,6-9,12 * page 4, line 18 - page 5, line 5; figure 4 * [I] 2,5,11,13,14; | [X]FR2795810 (MC INTERNAT [FR]) [X] 1,6,7,15* page 10, line 20 - page 21, line 32; figures 1-6 * | International search | [X]US5858957 (DONOGHUE SCOTT JOHN [BE], et al) [X] 1, 5-8* entire document *; | [X]US2017167770 (HEMRLE JAROSLAV [CH], et al) [X] 1-4, 22-31 * entire document * |