EP3670650 - CELL STRAIN FOR REDUCING PRODUCTION OF REPRODUCIBLE ADENOVIRUS, AND CONSTRUCTION METHOD AND USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2023 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.02.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cansino Biologics Inc. 401-420, Floor 4 Biomedical Park of West Zone 185 South Avenue TEDA West District Tianjin 300457 / CN | [2020/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHU, Tao 401-420 Floor 4 Biomedical Park of West Zone 185 South Avenue TEDA West District Tianjin 300457 / CN | 02 /
CUI, Haiyan 401-420 Floor 4 Biomedical Park of West Zone 185 South Avenue TEDA West District Tianjin 300457 / CN | 03 /
CHEN, Weiwei 401-420 Floor 4 Biomedical Park of West Zone 185 South Avenue TEDA West District Tianjin 300457 / CN | 04 /
DUAN, Lei 401-420 Floor 4 Biomedical Park of West Zone 185 South Avenue TEDA West District Tianjin 300457 / CN | 05 /
LI, Junqiang 401-420 Floor 4 Biomedical Park of West Zone 185 South Avenue TEDA West District Tianjin 300457 / CN | 06 /
MA, Jin 401-420 Floor 4 Biomedical Park of West Zone 185 South Avenue TEDA West District Tianjin 300457 / CN | 07 /
XIN, Chunlin 401-420 Floor 4 Biomedical Park of West Zone 185 South Avenue TEDA West District Tianjin 300457 / CN | 08 /
SHAO, Zhongqi 401-420 Floor 4 Biomedical Park of West Zone 185 South Avenue TEDA West District Tianjin 300457 / CN | 09 /
YU, Xuefeng 401-420 Floor 4 Biomedical Park of West Zone 185 South Avenue TEDA West District Tianjin 300457 / CN | 10 /
MAO, Helen Huihua 401-420 Floor 4 Biomedical Park of West Zone 185 South Avenue TEDA West District Tianjin 300457 / CN | [2020/26] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/23] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2020/26] | Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | Application number, filing date | 18851666.0 | 29.08.2018 | [2020/26] | WO2018CN102882 | Priority number, date | CN201710778032 | 01.09.2017 Original published format: CN201710778032 | [2020/26] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019042307 | Date: | 07.03.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3670650 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3670650 | Date: | 08.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/10, C12N15/85, C12N15/90, C12N7/00, C12R1/93 | [2020/26] | CPC: |
C12N15/86 (EP,US);
A61K39/235 (US);
C12N15/907 (EP);
C12N5/0686 (US);
C12N7/00 (EP);
C12N2310/20 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZELLSTAMM ZUR REDUKTION DER PRODUKTION VON REPRODUZIERBAREM ADENOVIRUS, KONSTRUKTIONSVERFAHREN UND VERWENDUNG | [2020/26] | English: | CELL STRAIN FOR REDUCING PRODUCTION OF REPRODUCIBLE ADENOVIRUS, AND CONSTRUCTION METHOD AND USE | [2020/26] | French: | SOUCHE CELLULAIRE POUR RÉDUIRE LA PRODUCTION D'ADÉNOVIRUS REPRODUCTIBLE ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONSTRUCTION ET UTILISATION | [2020/26] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2020 | Translation filed | 19.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 19.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/26] | 10.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.05.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.08.2018 | AL | 08.06.2022 | AT | 08.06.2022 | CY | 08.06.2022 | CZ | 08.06.2022 | DK | 08.06.2022 | EE | 08.06.2022 | ES | 08.06.2022 | FI | 08.06.2022 | HR | 08.06.2022 | IT | 08.06.2022 | LT | 08.06.2022 | LV | 08.06.2022 | MC | 08.06.2022 | MK | 08.06.2022 | NL | 08.06.2022 | PL | 08.06.2022 | RO | 08.06.2022 | RS | 08.06.2022 | SE | 08.06.2022 | SI | 08.06.2022 | SK | 08.06.2022 | SM | 08.06.2022 | TR | 08.06.2022 | IE | 29.08.2022 | LU | 29.08.2022 | BE | 31.08.2022 | CH | 31.08.2022 | LI | 31.08.2022 | BG | 08.09.2022 | NO | 08.09.2022 | GR | 09.09.2022 | IS | 08.10.2022 | PT | 10.10.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 29.08.2018 | |
AL | 08.06.2022 | ||
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CY | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
IT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
MK | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
IE | 29.08.2022 | ||
LU | 29.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/24] | HU | 29.08.2018 | |
AL | 08.06.2022 | ||
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CY | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
IT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
IE | 29.08.2022 | ||
LU | 29.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CY | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
IT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
IE | 29.08.2022 | ||
LU | 29.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
IT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
IE | 29.08.2022 | ||
LU | 29.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
IE | 29.08.2022 | ||
LU | 29.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
IE | 29.08.2022 | ||
LU | 29.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
LU | 29.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
LU | 29.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/16] | AT | 08.06.2022 | |
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | AT | 08.06.2022 | |
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AT | 08.06.2022 | |
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 08.06.2022 | |
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 08.06.2022 | |
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/02] | ES | 08.06.2022 | |
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | ES | 08.06.2022 | |
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | ES | 08.06.2022 | |
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | ES | 08.06.2022 | |
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - KOVESDI IMRE ET AL, "Adenoviral producer cells", VIRUSES, MDPI, CH, (20100816), vol. 2, no. 8, doi:10.3390/V2081681, ISSN 1999-4915, pages 1681 - 1703, XP008152094 [X] 1,2,6-15 * page 1681 - page 1703 * [I] 3-5 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/v2081681 | [XI] - D. STONE ET AL, "Development and Assessment of Human Adenovirus Type 11 as a Gene Transfer Vector", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (20050415), vol. 79, no. 8, doi:10.1128/JVI.79.8.5090-5104.2005, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 5090 - 5104, XP055052797 [X] 1,2,6-15 * page 5090 - page 5104 * [I] 3-5 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.79.8.5090-5104.2005 |