Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020245637 | Global Dossier | 06.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816645117 | 31.08.2018 | WO2018US49207 | 31.08.2018 | US201762553272 | 01.09.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2023036771 | Global Dossier | 14.03.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018US49207 | 31.08.2018 | US201762553272 | 01.09.2017 | JP2020512638 | 31.08.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2020534804 | Global Dossier | 03.12.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018US49207 | 31.08.2018 | US201762553272 | 01.09.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111050564 | Global Dossier | 21.04.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018US49207 | 31.08.2018 | US201762553272 | 01.09.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3073726 | Global Dossier | 07.03.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018US49207 | 31.08.2018 | US201762553272 | 01.09.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3675644 | Global Dossier | 26.05.2021 | A4 | EP3675644 | 08.07.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018US49207 | 31.08.2018 | US201762553272 | 01.09.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112020004222 | 07.11.2023 | B1 | BR112020004222 | 01.09.2020 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2018US49207 | 31.08.2018 | US201762553272 | 01.09.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2020001932 | 24.03.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018US49207 | 31.08.2018 | US201762553272 | 01.09.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019046785 | Global Dossier | 07.03.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762553272 | 01.09.2017 |