EP3677584 - COMPOUND HAVING BRUTON'S TYROSINE KINASE (BTK)-INHIBITION AND DEGRADATION ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shanghai Meizer Pharmaceuticals Co., Ltd. Room 3202 Building 3, 797 Puxing Road, Minhang District Shanghai 201114 / CN | [2020/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHU, Yongzhi Room 118 Building 20 No.1-42 Lane 83 Hongxiang North Road Wanxiang Town Pudong New Area Shanghai 201313 / CN | [2020/28] | Representative(s) | De Arpe Tejero, Manuel Arpe Patentes y Marcas Edificio Aqua, Calle Agustín de Foxá 4-10 C.P. 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2020/28] | Karl, Christof Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18852458.1 | 02.09.2018 | [2020/28] | WO2018CN103710 | Priority number, date | CN201710783076 | 03.09.2017 Original published format: CN201710783076 | [2020/28] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019042445 | Date: | 07.03.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3677584 | Date: | 08.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, A61K31/519, A61P35/00, A61P35/02, A61P37/02, A61P19/02, A61P17/06 | [2020/28] | CPC: |
A61P17/06 (EP);
C07D487/04 (EP,CN,US);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/28] | Title | German: | VERBINDUNG MIT BRUTON-TYROSINKINASE (BTK)-HEMMUNG UND ABBAU | [2020/28] | English: | COMPOUND HAVING BRUTON'S TYROSINE KINASE (BTK)-INHIBITION AND DEGRADATION ACTIVITY | [2020/28] | French: | COMPOSÉ AYANT UNE ACTIVITÉ D'INHIBITION ET DE DÉGRADATION DE LA TYROSINE KINASE DE BRUTON (BTK) | [2020/28] | Entry into regional phase | 03.04.2020 | Translation filed | 03.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 03.04.2020 | Search fee paid | 03.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CN | 03.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/28] | 11.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IP] - SUN Y ET AL., "PROTAC-induced BTK degradation as a novel therapy for mutated BTK C481S induced ibrutinib-resistant B-cell malignanciesPROTAC-induced BTK degradation as a novel therapy for mutated BTK C481S induced ibrutinib-resistant B-cell malignancies", CELL RESEARCH, (20180606), vol. 28, pages 779 - 781, XP055780525 [IP] 1-15 * compound of figure 1b * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41422- |