EP3676771 - SEED FULFILLMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.06.2020 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Monsanto Technology LLC 800 North Lindbergh Blvd. St. Louis, MO 63167 / US | [2020/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAITINGER, David, J. c/o Monsanto Company 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard Mail Zone E1NA Saint Louis Missouri 63167 / US | 02 /
HAHN, Brian, L. c/o Monsanto Company 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard Mail Zone E1NA Saint Louis Missouri 63167 / US | 03 /
MADDUX, Andrew c/o Monsanto Company 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard Mail Zone E1NA Saint Louis Missouri 63167 / US | 04 /
THOMPSON, Eric c/o Monsanto Company 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard Mail Zone E1NA Saint Louis Missouri 63167 / US | 05 /
WEYHRICH, Roger, A. c/o Monsanto Company 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard Mail Zone E1NA Saint Louis Missouri 63167 / US | [2020/28] | Representative(s) | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/28] | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 18852533.1 | 31.08.2018 | [2020/28] | WO2018US49211 | Priority number, date | US201762552876P | 31.08.2017 Original published format: US 201762552876 P | [2020/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019046788 | Date: | 07.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3676771 | Date: | 08.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/08, A01F12/50, B65B1/30, B65B7/16, B65B35/00, B65B35/10 | [2020/28] | CPC: |
B65B25/02 (EP,US);
A01F12/50 (US);
B65B1/30 (US);
B65B35/10 (US);
B65B57/20 (US);
B65B65/003 (US);
B65G47/08 (US);
B65G47/46 (US);
B65B35/30 (US);
B65B65/00 (US);
B65B7/16 (US);
B65G37/00 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/28] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR KOMMISSIONIERUNG VON SAATGUT | [2020/28] | English: | SEED FULFILLMENT SYSTEM | [2020/28] | French: | SYSTÈME D'EXÉCUTION DE GRAINES | [2020/28] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 23.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/28] | 14.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005092389 (MAZUR GREGORY [US], et al) [A] 1-20* figures 1-10 * | International search | [Y]US6015064 (LIU GANG [US]) [Y] 13 * entire document *; | [A]US2005060958 (HARMON DESTRY [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US2014157732 (GASBER DIRK [DE]) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [XY]US2014165506 (DEPPERMANN KEVIN L [US], et al) [X] 1, 12, 15, 17-20 * entire document * [Y] 13; | [A]US2016194153 (ISSING ELMAR [DE], et al) [A] 1-20* entire document * |