13.09.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.09.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.08.2023 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
24.07.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
24.07.2023 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
21.07.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
19.07.2023 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
27.03.2023 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.12.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.12.2022 |
First examination report |
|
16.09.2022 |
Change - applicant |
published on 19.10.2022 [2022/42] |
12.09.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.09.2022 |
Change - representative |
|
19.11.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
10.09.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.04.2021 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
16.04.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
16.04.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
13.11.2020 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] |
13.11.2020 |
Change - extension states |
published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] |
14.09.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.06.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 15.07.2020 [2020/29] |
12.06.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.07.2020 [2020/29] |
22.04.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.04.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.04.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
03.04.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
03.04.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.03.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.03.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|