EP3681173 - SOUND PICKUP DEVICE, SOUND PICKUP SYSTEM, SOUND PICKUP METHOD, PROGRAM, AND CALIBRATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.08.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.09.2022 [2022/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2020/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIROSE, Yoshifumi c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
ADACHI, Yusuke c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2020/29] | Representative(s) | Vigand, Philippe, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex - Genève / CH | [2020/29] | Application number, filing date | 18852945.7 | 04.07.2018 | [2020/29] | WO2018JP25300 | Priority number, date | JP20170173162 | 08.09.2017 Original published format: JP 2017173162 | [2020/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019049494 | Date: | 14.03.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3681173 | Date: | 15.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/40, H04N5/232, H04N7/15, H04R3/00 | [2020/29] | CPC: |
H04R1/406 (EP,US);
H04R3/005 (EP,US);
H04N23/50 (EP);
H04N23/54 (US);
H04N23/55 (US);
H04N23/60 (EP);
H04N23/695 (US);
H04N7/15 (EP);
H04R1/04 (US);
H04R29/005 (EP,US);
H04N23/698 (EP);
H04R1/026 (EP);
H04R1/028 (EP);
H04R1/083 (EP);
H04R2201/403 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/29] | Title | German: | TONAUFNAHMEVORRICHTUNG, TONAUFNAHMESYSTEM, TONAUFNAHMEVERFAHREN, PROGRAMM UND KALIBRIERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2020/29] | English: | SOUND PICKUP DEVICE, SOUND PICKUP SYSTEM, SOUND PICKUP METHOD, PROGRAM, AND CALIBRATION METHOD | [2020/29] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CAPTURE DE SON, SYSTÈME DE CAPTURE DE SON, PROCÉDÉ DE CAPTURE DE SON, PROGRAMME, ET PROCÉDÉ D'ÉTALONNAGE | [2020/29] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2020 | Translation filed | 29.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 29.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/29] | 18.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2013102251 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA], et al) [Y] 12* paragraph [0042] *; | [Y]US9262800 (CILIA ANDREW [US]) [Y] 2,4,5 * column 4, line 1 - line 11; figure 1 *; | [XYI]US2016227340 (PETERS NILS GÜNTHER [US]) [X] 1,6-9 * paragraphs [0037] , [ 0083] , [ 0095]; figures 7A, 7B, 7C * * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0086] * [Y] 2-5,10-15 [I] 16; | [Y]CN205450536U (XIA SHILIN, et al) [Y] 2,3 * figures 1, 2 *; | [Y]US2016381459 (BACA JIM S [US], et al) [Y] 10-15 * paragraphs [0020] , [ 0026] , [ 0053]; claims 1, 10 * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0088] - paragraph [0090] * | International search | [A]JP2016119621 (PANASONIC IP MAN CORP) [A] 15-16* , paragraphs [0049]-[0056], fig. 9 (Family: none) *; | [XA]US2016227340 (PETERS NILS GÜNTHER [US]) [X] 1, 6-9 * , paragraphs [0082]-[0086], fig. 6-8 & JP 2018-511070 A & WO 2016/126392 A1 * [A] 2-5, 10-16; | [A]JP2017139718 (SOTOGUCHI YOSHIKI) [A] 1-14 * , paragraphs [0024]-[0037], fig. 2-7 (Family: none) * | by applicant | JPS5215826B |