EP3678849 - SWIMMING POOL WITH COMPOSITE WALL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wilbar International, Inc. 50 Cabot Court Hauppauge, NY 11788 / US | For all designated states Avient Corporation 33587 Walker Road Avon Lake, OH 44012 / US | [2021/07] |
Former [2020/29] | For all designated states Wilbar International, Inc. 50 Cabot Court Hauppauge, NY 11788 / US | ||
For all designated states PolyOne Corporation 33587 Walker Road Avon Lake, OH 44012 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COHEN, Steven 7 Lewis Lane Locust Valley, NY 11560 / US | 02 /
SPIEGEL, Jonathan 33587 Walker Road Avon Lake, OH 44012 / US | 03 /
VALLEE, David 33587 Walker Road Avon Lake, OH 44012 / US | 04 /
PILPEL, Benjamin 33587 Walker Road Avon Lake, OH 44012 / US | 05 /
INMAN, Patrick, Masterson 118 Grove Road Kings Park, NY 11754 / US | 06 /
HORNICKEL, John, H. 33587 Walker Road Avon Lake, OH 44012 / US | [2020/29] | Representative(s) | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | [2020/29] | Application number, filing date | 18853085.1 | 06.09.2018 | [2020/29] | WO2018US49697 | Priority number, date | US201762556055P | 08.09.2017 Original published format: US 201762556055 P | US201862666457P | 03.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862666457 P | [2020/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019051049 | Date: | 14.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3678849 | Date: | 15.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B29C70/06, E04H4/00, B29C70/68 | [2021/41] | CPC: |
B29C70/682 (EP);
E04H4/0043 (EP,US);
E04H2004/0068 (US)
|
Former IPC [2020/29] | B29C70/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/29] | Title | German: | SCHWIMMBECKEN MIT VERBUNDWAND | [2020/29] | English: | SWIMMING POOL WITH COMPOSITE WALL | [2020/29] | French: | PISCINE À PAROI COMPOSITE | [2020/29] | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.2020 | Search fee paid | 06.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/29] | 05.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US3208084 (COLLINS FORREST M, et al) [X] 1,2,6 * columns 1-5; figures 1-7; claims 1-3 * [Y] 4,5 [I] 3,4; | [YA]US2004078884 (PUGLIESE ANGELO VITO [US], et al) [Y] 4 * figures 1,2 * [A] 1; | [YA]DE202004009531U (KRUK KUNSTSTOFFE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 5 * paragraph [0003]; figure 1 *[A] 1 | International search | [YA]US4177614 (ARP GEORGE F [US]) [Y] 13-17, 32 * Fig. 1; col 2 In 3-6, 9-11 * [A] 11, 18-22; | [Y]US5010603 (HERTZOG LEWIS R [US]) [Y] 1-5, 7 * Figs. 1, 3; col 2 In 63-69, col 4 In 44-53. *; | [YA]US5151322 (KIMOTO YUKITANE [JP], et al) [Y] 1-5, 7-10, 13-17, 23-30, 32-33 * Fig. 4; col 4 In 45-56 * [A] 11, 31, 34; | [YA]US5328744 (KAUFMANN CHRISTINE M [US], et al) [Y] 23-33 * Fig. 1A; col 3 In 11-27 *[A] 18-22, 31, 34; | [Y]AU2016204704 (NORTH STAR TECHNOLOGY INTERNAT LTD) [Y] 1-5, 7-10, 23-25 * Fig 2; col 3 ln 37-39, 51-56 * | by applicant | US3208084 | US2004078884 | DE202004009531U |