EP3679449 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR DISTRIBUTING POWER IN A POWER-TO-THE-EDGE SYSTEM ARCHITECTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.01.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Outdoor Wireless Networks LLC 3642 E. US Highway 70 Claremont North Carolina 28610 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2024/36] | For all designated states Outdoor Wireless Networks LLC 3642 E. US Highway 70 Claremont North Carolina 28610 / US | ||
Former [2024/21] | For all designated states CommScope Technologies LLC 3642 E US Highway 70 Claremont, NC 28610 / US | ||
Former [2020/29] | For all designated states CommScope Technologies LLC 1100 CommScope Place SE Hickory, NC 28602 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAMBERT, David Thomas c/o CommScope Technologies LLC 1100 CommScope Place SE Hickory North Carolina 28602 / US | 02 /
HOLLOWAY, Lee c/o CommScope Technologies LLC 1100 CommScope Place SE Hickory North Carolina 28602 / US | 03 /
WILLIAMS, Andrew c/o CommScope Technologies LLC 1100 CommScope Place SE Hickory North Carolina 28602 / US | 04 /
THOMAS, David c/o CommScope Technologies LLC 1100 CommScope Place SE Hickory North Carolina 28602 / US | [2020/29] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/29] | Parker, Andrew James Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18853487.9 | 07.09.2018 | [2020/29] | WO2018US49862 | Priority number, date | US201762556029P | 08.09.2017 Original published format: US 201762556029 P | [2020/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019051170 | Date: | 14.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3679449 | Date: | 15.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/18, G06F11/30, H02J13/00 | [2020/29] | CPC: |
H02M7/02 (EP);
H02M1/32 (EP,US);
G06F1/26 (US);
H02J1/08 (EP);
H02J1/082 (EP);
H02J13/00002 (EP);
H02J13/00016 (EP);
H02M3/156 (US);
H04L12/10 (EP,US);
H02J13/00017 (EP);
H02J13/00036 (EP);
H02M1/008 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01H35/00, G05F1/46 (US);
H02H3/20, H02H3/08 (US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/29] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERTEILEN VON LEISTUNG IN EINER LEISTUNG-ZU-KANTE-SYSTEMARCHITEKTUR | [2020/29] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR DISTRIBUTING POWER IN A POWER-TO-THE-EDGE SYSTEM ARCHITECTURE | [2020/29] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE DISTRIBUTION D'ALIMENTATION DANS UNE ARCHITECTURE DE SYSTÈME « POWER-TO-THE-EDGE » | [2020/29] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2020 | Search fee paid | 08.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/29] | 07.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2005044431 (LANG JONATHAN P [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0031] - [0036]; figures 1,2,3,4,5,8 *; | [I]US2011310519 (BABA MASANORI [JP], et al) [I] 1 * paragraphs [0056] - [0065]; figures 3,4 *; | [I]US9377794 (DWELLEY DAVID [US], et al) [I] 1 * column 1, line 43 - column 3, line 2; figures 1, 7-17 ** column 4, lines 12-38 * | International search | [A]US2005136989 (DOVE DANIEL J [US]) [A] 1-39 * See paragraphs [0015]-[0020]; claims 1-8, 20-21; and figure 2. *; | [A]US2011006607 (KWON WON-OK [KR], et al) [A] 1-39 * See paragraphs [0023], [0025]-[0026], [0028], [0040], [0045]; claims 1-2; and figures 1-3. *; | [A]US2012206064 (ARCHENHOLD GEOFFREY HOWARD GILLETT [GB]) [A] 1-39 * See abstract; paragraphs [0256]-[0259]; and figures 4, 12-13. *; | [A]US2013173939 (PETO RAYMOND [GB]) [A] 1-39* See abstract; claims 1-6; and figures 2B, 4. *; | [A]US2014258742 (CHIEN CHING-YUN [TW], et al) [A] 1-39 * See abstract; paragraph [0006]; and claim 1. * |