EP3681522 - MAMMAL-SPECIFIC GROWTH-DEFECTIVE ARBOVIRUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.06.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tengen Biomedical Company 7220 Grubby Thicket Way Bethesda, MD 20817 / US | [2020/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PANG, Xiaowu 5260 Pooks Hill Road Bethesda MD 20817 / US | 02 /
GU, Xinbin 7220 Grubby Thicket Way Bethesda MD 20817 / US | [2020/30] | Representative(s) | Bohmann, Armin K. Bohmann Anwaltssozietät Nymphenburger Straße 1 80335 München / DE | [2020/30] | Application number, filing date | 18854619.6 | 11.09.2018 | [2020/30] | WO2018US50341 | Priority number, date | US201762556892P | 11.09.2017 Original published format: US 201762556892 P | [2020/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019051445 | Date: | 14.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3681522 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 14.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/76, C07K14/18, C07K14/175, C12N7/04 | [2020/30] | CPC: |
C12N7/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/12 (EP,KR);
A61P31/12 (KR);
C07K14/005 (EP,KR);
A61K2039/5254 (EP,KR);
C12N2710/12034 (EP,KR,US);
C12N2720/12034 (EP,KR);
C12N2720/12134 (EP,KR);
C12N2760/12034 (EP,KR);
C12N2760/12234 (EP,KR);
C12N2770/24122 (EP,KR,US);
C12N2770/24134 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/30] | Title | German: | SÄUGERSPEZIFISCHES WACHSTUMSDEFEKTES ARBOVIRUS | [2020/30] | English: | MAMMAL-SPECIFIC GROWTH-DEFECTIVE ARBOVIRUS | [2020/30] | French: | ARBOVIRUS À CROISSANCE DÉFECTUEUSE SPÉCIFIQUE D'UN MAMMIFÈRE | [2020/30] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/30] | 10.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2009004721 (KEELAPANG POONSOOK [TH], et al); | [Y]WO2016210127 (TECHNOVAX INC [US]); |