EP3640547 - MULTI-SPLIT AIR CONDITIONING SYSTEM AND CONTROL METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gree Electric Appliances (Wuhan) Co., Ltd. No. 888 Dongfeng Avenue Economic & Technology Development Zone Wuhan Hubei 430056 / CN | For all designated states Gree Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai West Jinji Road Qianshan Zhuhai, Guangdong 519070 / CN | [2020/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIAO, Huachao West Jinji Road Qianshan Zhuhai City Guangdong 519070 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Shiqiang West Jinji Road Qianshan Zhuhai City Guangdong 519070 / CN | 03 /
WU, Lianfa West Jinji Road Qianshan Zhuhai City Guangdong 519070 / CN | 04 /
XIONG, Jianguo West Jinji Road Qianshan Zhuhai City Guangdong 519070 / CN | 05 /
ZHOU, Bing West Jinji Road Qianshan Zhuhai City Guangdong 519070 / CN | 06 /
HUANG, Zhiguang West Jinji Road Qianshan Zhuhai City Guangdong 519070 / CN | 07 /
LI, Donghui West Jinji Road Qianshan Zhuhai City Guangdong 519070 / CN | 08 /
QIU, Bo West Jinji Road Qianshan ZhuhaiCity Guangdong 519070 / CN | [2020/17] | Representative(s) | Nevett, Duncan Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [2020/17] | Application number, filing date | 18855086.7 | 06.09.2018 | [2020/17] | WO2018CN104344 | Priority number, date | CN201710800560 | 07.09.2017 Original published format: CN201710800560 | [2020/17] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019047889 | Date: | 14.03.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3640547 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3640547 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 14.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F24F1/00, F24F11/61, F24F11/77, F24F13/22, F25B31/00, F24F110/20, F24F11/86, F24F11/70, F25B49/02 | [2023/03] | CPC: |
F24F11/77 (EP,US);
F24F11/86 (EP,US);
F24F11/70 (EP);
F24F13/22 (EP);
F25B31/002 (EP);
F25B49/02 (EP);
F24F2013/221 (EP);
F25B2313/0233 (EP);
F25B2313/0293 (EP);
Y02B30/70 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/40] | F24F1/00, F24F11/61, F24F11/77, F24F13/22, F25B31/00, F25B41/06, F24F110/20, F24F11/86, F24F11/70 | ||
Former IPC [2020/17] | F24F1/00, F24F11/61, F24F11/77, F24F13/22, F25B31/00, F25B41/06, F24F110/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MULTI-SPLIT-KLIMAANLAGE UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2020/17] | English: | MULTI-SPLIT AIR CONDITIONING SYSTEM AND CONTROL METHOD THEREFOR | [2020/17] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CLIMATISATION À DIVISIONS MULTIPLES ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE ASSOCIÉ | [2020/17] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2020 | Translation filed | 17.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 17.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/17] | 17.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 03.05.2023 | DK | 03.05.2023 | EE | 03.05.2023 | ES | 03.05.2023 | FI | 03.05.2023 | HR | 03.05.2023 | LT | 03.05.2023 | LV | 03.05.2023 | MC | 03.05.2023 | NL | 03.05.2023 | PL | 03.05.2023 | RO | 03.05.2023 | RS | 03.05.2023 | SE | 03.05.2023 | SI | 03.05.2023 | SK | 03.05.2023 | SM | 03.05.2023 | NO | 03.08.2023 | GR | 04.08.2023 | IS | 03.09.2023 | PT | 04.09.2023 | IE | 06.09.2023 | LU | 06.09.2023 | BE | 30.09.2023 | CH | 30.09.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | CZ | 03.05.2023 | |
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
MC | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SI | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
IE | 06.09.2023 | ||
LU | 06.09.2023 | ||
CH | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/33] | CZ | 03.05.2023 | |
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
MC | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SI | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
IE | 06.09.2023 | ||
LU | 06.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | CZ | 03.05.2023 | |
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
MC | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SI | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
LU | 06.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/25] | CZ | 03.05.2023 | |
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SI | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
LU | 06.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | CZ | 03.05.2023 | |
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SI | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 03.05.2023 | |
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 03.05.2023 | |
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | ES | 03.05.2023 | |
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | ES | 03.05.2023 | |
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 03.05.2023 | |
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 03.05.2023 | |
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 03.05.2023 | |
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 03.05.2023 | |
PT | 04.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP3006845 (GREE ELECTRIC APPLIANCES INC [CN]) [X] 15 * paragraph [0005]; figures 1,2 * [A] 1-12; | [XA]EP3091310 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [X] 15 * figures 1-4 * [A] 1-12; | [XI]CN106403192 (GREE ELECTRIC APPLIANCES INC ZHUHAI) [X] 15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0012] - [0014] - [0016] , [0051] , [0059]; figures 1-4; claims 1,3 * [I] 1-12; | [XA]EP3176516 (TOSHIBA CARRIER CORP [JP]) [X] 15 * paragraph [0060]; figures 1-9 *[A] 1-12 |