EP3679498 - IMPROVING FRAUD DETECTION BY PROFILING AGGREGATE CUSTOMER ANONYMOUS BEHAVIOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.01.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fair Isaac Corporation Rosedale Corporate Plaza 2665 Long Lake Road, Building C Roseville, MN 55113 / US | [2020/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZOLDI, Scott, Michael Rosedale Corporate Plaza 2665 Long Lake Road, Buildings C Roseville, MN 55113 / US | 02 /
XU, Heming Rosedale Corporate Plaza 2665 Long Lake Road, Building C Roseville, MN 5513 / US | [2020/29] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2020/29] | Application number, filing date | 18855092.5 | 04.09.2018 | [2020/29] | WO2018US49405 | Priority number, date | US201715697375 | 06.09.2017 Original published format: US201715697375 | [2020/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019050864 | Date: | 14.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3679498 | Date: | 15.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q20/40, G06Q20/10 | [2021/04] | CPC: |
G06Q20/10 (EP,US);
G06Q20/383 (EP,US);
G06Q20/4016 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0601 (US)
|
Former IPC [2020/29] | G06F21/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/29] | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNG DER BETRUGSERKENNUNG DURCH PROFILIERUNG VON ANONYMEM GESAMTVERHALTEN VON KUNDEN | [2020/29] | English: | IMPROVING FRAUD DETECTION BY PROFILING AGGREGATE CUSTOMER ANONYMOUS BEHAVIOR | [2020/29] | French: | AMÉLIORATION DE LA DÉTECTION DE FRAUDE PAR PROFILAGE D'UN COMPORTEMENT GLOBAL ANONYME DE CLIENT | [2020/29] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2020 | Search fee paid | 20.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/29] | 09.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US7403922 (LEWIS MICHAEL [US], et al) [Y] 1-21 * , entire document, especially abstract, col. 2, In 45-58, col. 7, In 13-24, col. 9, In 8-18, col. 12, In 49-53, col. 14, In 3-66, col. 15, In 3-58, col. 22, In 62-67, col. 23, In 1-50, col. 26. In 33-46. *; | [Y]US2014250011 (WEBER LANCE [US]) [Y] 1-21 * , entire document, especially abstract, para [0053], [0084]. *; | [A]US2011066493 (FAITH PATRICK L [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * , entire document, especially abstract. * | by applicant | US7403922 | US2014250011 |