EP3823669 - COMBINATION OF AN AGONIST ANTI-PD-1 ANTIBODY WITH A GNRH AGONIST OR ANTAGONIST TO TREAT CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Debiopharm International SA Forum "après-demain" Ch. Messidor 5-7 1002 Lausanne / CH | [2021/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEJEUNE, Ferdinand Chemin du Levant 98 1005 Lausanne / CH | 02 /
GAVILLET, Bruno 430 Route de Pitegny Mourex 01220 Grilly / FR | [2021/21] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/21] | Application number, filing date | 18855156.8 | 18.12.2018 | [2021/21] | WO2018IB01445 | Priority number, date | WO2017IB01576 | 18.12.2017 Original published format: PCT/IB2017/001576 | [2021/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019122998 | Date: | 27.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3823669 | Date: | 26.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, C07K16/28, A61P35/00, A61K38/08 | [2021/21] | CPC: |
A61K39/3955 (EP,CN);
A61K45/06 (EP,CN);
A61K38/09 (EP,US);
A61K31/427 (US);
A61K31/47 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP,CN,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K39/3955, A61K2300/00 (CN,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/21] | Title | German: | KOMBINATION EINES AGONISTISCHEN ANTI-PD-1-ANTIKÖRPERS MIT GNRH-AGONIST ODER ANTAGONIST ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS | [2021/21] | English: | COMBINATION OF AN AGONIST ANTI-PD-1 ANTIBODY WITH A GNRH AGONIST OR ANTAGONIST TO TREAT CANCER | [2021/21] | French: | COMBINAISON D'UN ANTICORPS AGONISTE ANTI-PD-1 AVEC UN AGONISTE OU ANTAGONISTE GNRH POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER | [2021/21] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/53] | 21.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/53] | 26.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/18] | 26.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/21] | 21.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 26.03.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 26.03.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.04.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 26.03.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 26.03.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.04.2021 | Decision despatched | 26.03.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 26.03.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.04.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 26.03.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 26.03.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.04.2021 | Decision despatched | 26.03.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 26.03.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.04.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 11.01.2021 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.03.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2015200828 (H LEE MOFFIT CANCER CT AND RES INST INC [US], et al) [X] 1-5,13,14,22-27,35,36 * page 2, line 18 - page 3, line 8 * * examples 1,2 * * claims 1-3,10-15 *; | [YA]WO2016176504 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US]) [Y] 1-20,22-42 * the whole document * [A] 21,43; | [X]WO2017214562 (WISCONSIN ALUMNI RES FOUND [US]) [X] 1,5,7,11,12,18,22,23,27,29,33,34,40 * paragraph [0011] * * examples 6,7 *; | [YA] - LIMONTA P ET AL, "GnRH receptors in cancer: From cell biology to novel targeted therapeutic strategies", ENDOCRINE REVIEWS, THE ENDOCRINE SOCIETY, US, (20121001), vol. 33, no. 5, doi:10.1210/ER.2012-1014, ISSN 0163-769X, pages 784 - 811, XP009167657 [Y] 1-20,22-42 * page 792; table 3 * * page 795, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 797, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 788; table 2 * [A] 21,43 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/er.2012-1014 | [A] - SUMIT K. SUBUDHI ET AL, "Clonal expansion of CD8 T cells in the systemic circulation precedes development of ipilimumab-induced toxicities", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, US, (20161003), vol. 113, no. 42, doi:10.1073/pnas.1611421113, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 11919 - 11924, XP055587842 [A] 1-43 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1611421113 | [XPI] - Bachem, "Melanoma Peptides", Peptide Trends, (20181201), pages 1 - 5, URL: https://www.bachem.com/service-support/newsletter/peptide-trends-december-2018/, (20190513), XP055587861 [XP] 1,22,23 * page 4 * [I] 2-21,24-43 | [XPI] - Thierry Lesimple, "debio 8200-imm-101", Annuaire des essais cliniques, (20180623), URL: https://www.pole-cancerologie-bretagne.fr/newsletter/items/382.html, (20190513), XP055587974 [XP] 1,22,23 * the whole document * [I] 1-21,24-43 | [A] - DANIEL Y. WANG ET AL, "Clinical Features of Acquired Resistance to Anti-PD-1 Therapy in Advanced Melanoma", CANCER IMMUNOLOGY RESEARCH, US, (20170410), vol. 5, no. 5, doi:10.1158/2326-6066.CIR-16-0287, ISSN 2326-6066, pages 357 - 362, XP055588830 [A] 1-43 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/2326-6066.CIR-16-0287 | by applicant | - LEACH et al., Science, (19960000), vol. 271, pages 1734 - 1736 | - LINSLEY et al., Immunity, (19940000), vol. 1, pages 793 - 801 | - RUDD et al., Immunol. Rev., (20090000), vol. 229, pages 12 - 26 | - SCHNEIDER et al., Science, (20060000), vol. 313, pages 1972 - 1975 | - TIVOL et al., Immunity, (19950000), vol. 3, pages 541 - 547 | - WATERHOUSE et al., Science, (19950000), vol. 270, pages 985 - 988 | - PHAN et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (20030000), vol. 100, pages 8372 - 8377 | - SCHADENDORF et al., J. Clin. Oncol., (20150000), vol. 33, pages 1889 - 1894 | - PARRY et al., Mol. Cell. Biol., (20050000), vol. 25, pages 9543 - 9553 | - WING et al., Science, (20080000), vol. 322, pages 271 - 275 | - PEGGS et al., J. Exp. Med., (20090000), vol. 206, pages 1717 - 1725 | - DONG et al., Nat. Med., (19990000), vol. 5, pages 1365 - 1369 | - LATCHMAN et al., Nat. Immunol., (20010000), pages 261 - 268 | - TSENG et al., J. Exp. Med., (20010000), vol. 193, pages 839 - 846 | - TUMEH et al., Nature, (20140000), vol. 515, pages 568 - 571 | - NISHIMURA et al., Immunity, (19990000), vol. 11, pages 141 - 151 | - Science, (20010000), vol. 291, pages 319 - 322 | - DONG et al., Nat. Med., (20020000), vol. 8, pages 793 - 800 | - ANSELL et al., N. Engl. J. Med., (20150000), vol. 372, pages 311 - 319 | - AMADZADEH et al., Blood, (20090000), vol. 114, pages 1537 - 1544 | - SFANOS et al., Prostate, (20090000), vol. 69, pages 1694 - 1703 | - TOPALIAN et al., N. Engl. J. Med., (20120000), vol. 366, pages 2443 - 2454 | - J. Clin. Oncol., (20140000), vol. 32, pages 1020 - 1030 | - LEJEUNE, Melanoma Res., (20150000), vol. 25, pages 373 - 375 | - WOLCHOK et al., N. Engl. J. Med., (20130000), vol. 369, pages 122 - 133 | - MATSUO et al., Biophys. Biochem. Res. Commun, (19710000), vol. 43, pages 1334 - 1339 | - BURGUS et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19720000), vol. 69, pages 278 - 282 | - COSTA et al., Prog. NeuroEndocrinlmmunology, (19900000), vol. 3, pages 55 - 60 | - BATTICANE et al., Endocrinol., (19910000), vol. 129, pages 277 - 286 | - STANDAERT et al., Biology of Reproduction, (19920000), vol. 46, pages 997 - 1000 | - MARCHETTI et al., Endocrinol., (19890000), vol. 125, pages 1025 - 1036 | - CHEN et al., J. Clin. Endocrin. Metab., (19990000), vol. 84, pages 743 - 750 | - TANRIVERDI et al., Clin. Exp. Immunol., (20050000), vol. 142, pages 103 - 110 | - DIXIT et al., Endocrinol., (20030000), vol. 144, pages 1496 - 1505 | - DIXIT et al., Biology of Reproduction, (20030000), vol. 68, pages 2215 - 2221 | - POLANCZYK et al., J. Immunol., (20040000), vol. 173, pages 2227 - 2230 | - TAI et al., J. Cell. Physiol., (20080000), vol. 214, pages 456 - 64 | - LAMBERT et al., J. Immunol., (20050000), vol. 175, pages 5716 - 5723 | - WOMEN. HO et al., American Journal of Reproductive Immunology, (19950000), vol. 33, pages 243 - 252 | - KISSICK et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (20140000), vol. 111, pages 9887 - 9892 | - RODEN et al., J. Immunol., (20040000), vol. 173, pages 6098 - 6108 | - MERCADER et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (20010000), vol. 98, no. 25, pages 14565 - 14570 | - SUTHERLAND et al., J. Immunol., (20050000), vol. 175, pages 2741 - 2753 | - SUTHERLAND et al., Clin. Cancer Res., (20080000), vol. 14, pages 1138 - 1149 | - JOHNKE et al., Anticancer Res., (20050000), vol. 25, pages 3159 - 3166 | - AKINS et al., Cancer Res., (20100000), vol. 70, pages 3473 - 3482 | - EISENHAUER, E.A., Eur. J. Cancer, (20090000), vol. 45, pages 228 - 47 | - SEYMOUR, L. et al., "iRECIST: guidelines for response criteria for use in trials testing immunotherapeutics", Lancet Oncol, (20170000), vol. 18, no. 3, pages e143 - e152 |