EP3698365 - SYSTEM, APPARATUS, AND METHOD FOR SEQUENCE-BASED ENZYME EC NUMBER PREDICTION BY DEEP LEARNING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.04.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states King Abdullah University Of Science And Technology 4700 King Abdullah University Of Science and Technology Technology Transfer Office Thuwal 23955-6900 / SA | [2020/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAO, Xin 4700 King Abdullah University of Science and Technology Thuwal 23955-6900 / SA | 02 /
LI, Yu 4700 King Abdullah University of Science and Technology Thuwal 23955-6900 / SA | [2020/35] | Representative(s) | Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [2020/35] | Application number, filing date | 18855200.4 | 16.10.2018 | [2020/35] | WO2018IB58015 | Priority number, date | US201762572658P | 16.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762572658 P | US201862689449P | 25.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862689449 P | [2020/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019077494 | Date: | 25.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3698365 | Date: | 26.08.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G16B15/20, G16B40/30 | [2020/35] | CPC: |
G16B15/20 (EP,US);
G16B5/20 (US);
G06N3/044 (EP,US);
G06N3/045 (EP,US);
G06N3/08 (US);
G06N3/084 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/35] | Title | German: | SYSTEM, VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR SEQUENZBASIERTEN ENZYM-EC-ZAHLVORHERSAGE DURCH TIEFENLERNEN | [2020/35] | English: | SYSTEM, APPARATUS, AND METHOD FOR SEQUENCE-BASED ENZYME EC NUMBER PREDICTION BY DEEP LEARNING | [2020/35] | French: | SYSTÈME, APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉDICTION DE NUMÉRO EC D'ENZYME BASÉE SUR UNE SÉQUENCE PAR APPRENTISSAGE PROFOND | [2020/35] | Entry into regional phase | 09.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 09.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/35] | 09.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/22] | 23.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2023 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI] - EVANGELIA I. ZACHARAKI, "Discussion", PEERJ COMPUTER SCIENCE, (20170717), vol. 3, doi:10.7717/peerj-cs.124, page e124, XP055575106 [X] 1 * whole document, in particular titles, p. 3-5,11, table 1, fig. 1 * [I] 2-20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.7717/peerj-cs.124 | [XA] - EYAD HAMAD ET AL, "Neural Network Based Prediction of 3D Protein Structure as a Function of Enzyme Family Type and Amino Acid Sequences Image Analysis View project Biomedical Analysis View project Neural Network Based Prediction of 3D Protein Structure as a Function of Enzyme Family Type and Amino Acid Sequences", JJBS JORDAN JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL SCIENCES, (20170601), vol. 10, XP055575708 [X] 1 * whole doc, in particular title, abstract, 3.1. fig. 1, table 1 * [A] 2-20 | [A] - VIOLA VOLPATO ET AL, "Accurate prediction of protein enzymatic class by N-to-1 Neural Networks", BMC BIOINFORMATICS, BIOMED CENTRAL, LONDON, GB, (20130114), vol. 14, no. Suppl 1, doi:10.1186/1471-2105-14-S1-S11, ISSN 1471-2105, page S11, XP021134555 [A] 1-20 * p.2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1471-2105-14-S1-S11 | [XP] - YU LI ET AL, "DEEPre: sequence-based enzyme EC number prediction by deep learning", BIOINFORMATICS., GB, (20171023), vol. 34, no. 5, doi:10.1093/bioinformatics/btx680, ISSN 1367-4803, pages 760 - 769, XP055574826 [XP] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/bioinformatics/btx680 |