EP3683834 - ARRAY SUBSTRATE, DISPLAY PANEL, AND DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOE Technology Group Co., Ltd. No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Rd. Chaoyang District Beijing 100015 / CN | [2020/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHENG, Hongfei No. 9, Dize Road, BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | [2020/30] | Representative(s) | Gesthuysen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Huyssenallee 68 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/30] | Gesthuysen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Huyssenallee 100 45128 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 18855818.3 | 02.08.2018 | [2020/30] | WO2018CN98286 | Priority number, date | CN201721170305U | 12.09.2017 Original published format: CN 201721170305 U | [2020/30] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019052284 | Date: | 21.03.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3683834 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/12, H01L27/32, H01L29/417 | [2021/23] | CPC: |
H01L27/124 (EP);
G02F1/1333 (KR);
H10K59/124 (US);
G02F1/1362 (KR);
H01L27/12 (KR);
H01L27/1222 (RU);
H01L27/1248 (EP);
H01L29/41733 (EP);
H10K59/12 (RU);
|
Former IPC [2020/30] | H01L27/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/30] | Title | German: | ANZEIGESUBSTRAT, ANZEIGETAFEL UND ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2020/30] | English: | ARRAY SUBSTRATE, DISPLAY PANEL, AND DISPLAY DEVICE | [2020/30] | French: | SUBSTRAT DE MATRICE, PANNEAU D'AFFICHAGE ET DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE | [2020/30] | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2019 | Translation filed | 10.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2019 | Search fee paid | 10.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2019 | Examination requested [2020/30] | 13.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2005110021 (PARK SANG-IL [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,10,11,13-15 * figures 1,2C * [I] 12; | [A]US2005255688 (MORIWAKI MINORU [JP]) [A] 1-15 * figures 6,9 ** paragraph [0081] *; | [XI]US2005263755 (KANG TAE-WOOK [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,6,10,11,13-15 * figure 1C * [I] 4,5,12; | [XI]US2016343784 (SHI LONGQIANG [CN], et al) [X] 1-3,6,13-15 * figure 1 * [I] 10-12; | [A]WO2017043529 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1-15 * figures 19-21D *; | [AP]US2018212198 (INOUE SATOSHI [JP], et al) [AP] 1-15 * paragraph [0150] * * paragraph [0209] - paragraph [0226]; figures 19-21D * | International search | [A]CN102751311 (SAMSUNG MOBILE DISPLAY CO LTD) [A] 1-20* entire document *; | [X]US2014117323 (AHN KI-WAN [KR]) [X] 1-7, 12-20 * description, paragraphs 33-73, and figure 3 *; | [A]US2017141172 (CHO SEUNGHWAN [KR], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [PX]CN207165572U (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD) [PX] 1-20 * entire document * |