EP3681576 - STRESS REDUCTION AND SLEEP PROMOTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.07.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.08.2023 [2023/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sleepme Inc. 114 Talbert Pointe Drive, Suite 103 Mooresville, NC 28117 / US | [2022/15] |
Former [2022/14] | For all designated states Kryo, Inc. 144 Talbert Pointe Drive, Suite 103 Mooresville, NC 28117 / US | ||
Former [2020/30] | For all designated states Youngblood IP Holdings, LLC 144 Talbert Pointe Drive Suite 103 Mooresville, NC 28117-4381 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOUNGBLOOD, Todd 122 Cloverhill Road Moorsville, NC 28117 / US | 02 /
YOUNGBLOOD, Tara 122 Cloverhill Road Moorsville, NC 28117 / US | [2020/30] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/30] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 18856293.8 | 11.09.2018 | [2020/30] | WO2018US50463 | Priority number, date | US201715705829 | 15.09.2017 Original published format: US201715705829 | US201715848816 | 20.12.2017 Original published format: US201715848816 | [2020/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2019055414 | Date: | 21.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3681576 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A47C31/00, A47C21/04, A47C27/14 | [2021/30] | CPC: |
F25D15/00 (EP);
A61B5/165 (EP);
A61M21/02 (EP);
A61N2/004 (EP);
A61N2/006 (EP);
A61N2/02 (EP);
A61N2/06 (EP);
A61N5/0618 (EP);
F25B21/02 (EP);
G04G13/02 (EP);
G04G21/02 (EP);
G04G21/025 (EP);
A61B5/01 (EP);
A61B5/024 (EP);
A61B5/0537 (EP);
A61B5/0816 (EP);
A61B5/11 (EP);
A61B5/14542 (EP);
A61B5/14546 (EP);
A61B5/369 (EP);
A61B5/389 (EP);
A61B5/4812 (EP);
A61M2021/0016 (EP);
A61M2021/0022 (EP);
A61M2021/0027 (EP);
A61M2021/0033 (EP);
A61M2021/0044 (EP);
A61M2021/0055 (EP);
A61M2021/0066 (EP);
A61M2021/0072 (EP);
A61M2021/0083 (EP);
A61M2205/051 (EP);
A61M2205/052 (EP);
A61M2205/054 (EP);
A61M2205/057 (EP);
A61M2205/3303 (EP);
A61M2205/3306 (EP);
A61M2205/332 (EP);
A61M2205/3358 (EP);
A61M2205/3368 (EP);
A61M2205/3375 (EP);
A61M2205/3386 (EP);
A61M2205/3553 (EP);
A61M2205/3561 (EP);
A61M2205/3569 (EP);
A61M2205/3584 (EP);
A61M2205/3592 (EP);
A61M2205/505 (EP);
A61M2205/52 (EP);
A61M2205/70 (EP);
A61M2209/088 (EP);
A61M2230/04 (EP);
A61M2230/06 (EP);
A61M2230/10 (EP);
A61M2230/14 (EP);
A61M2230/20 (EP);
A61M2230/205 (EP);
A61M2230/30 (EP);
A61M2230/42 (EP);
A61M2230/50 (EP);
A61M2230/60 (EP);
A61M2230/63 (EP);
A61M2230/65 (EP);
A61N1/36025 (EP);
A61N2005/0663 (EP);
F25B2321/0252 (EP);
F25D17/02 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61M2230/04, A61M2230/005 (EP);
A61M2230/06, A61M2230/005 (EP);
A61M2230/10, A61M2230/005 (EP);
A61M2230/14, A61M2230/005 (EP);
A61M2230/205, A61M2230/005 (EP);
A61M2230/20, A61M2230/005 (EP);
A61M2230/30, A61M2230/005 (EP);
A61M2230/42, A61M2230/005 (EP);
A61M2230/50, A61M2230/005 (EP);
A61M2230/60, A61M2230/005 (EP); |
Former IPC [2020/30] | A61M21/02, A61B5/00, A61B5/024, A61B5/11, A47C21/04, F25D29/00, A47C21/02, F25D17/02, A47C31/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/30] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR VERRINGERUNG VON STRESS UND FÖRDERUNG DES SCHLAFES | [2020/30] | English: | STRESS REDUCTION AND SLEEP PROMOTION SYSTEM | [2020/30] | French: | SYSTÈME DE RÉDUCTION DU STRESS ET DE PROMOTION DU SOMMEIL | [2020/30] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 11.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/30] | 05.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9823236 (KINETIC CONCEPTS INC [US]); | [A]CN101401695 (JIAXING HUIHONG WARM & COOL TE [CN]); | [Y]US2010174198 (YOUNG STEVEN J [US], et al) | International search | [A]US5448788 (WU SHUENN-JENQ [TW]); | [Y]US2002014951 (KRAMER KENNETH L [US], et al); | [Y]US2011107514 (BRYKALSKI MICHAEL [US], et al); | [Y]KR20110102637 (LEE SANG HONG [KR]); | [Y]US2016029808 (YOUNGBLOOD TODD [US], et al) |