EP3682196 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR CALIBRATING IMAGING AND SPATIAL ORIENTATION SENSORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.02.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nie, Xiaochun 964 Rincon Street Mountain View, California 94040 / US | [2020/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2020/30] | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [2020/30] | Application number, filing date | 18856376.1 | 05.09.2018 | [2020/30] | WO2018US49469 | Priority number, date | US201762557786P | 13.09.2017 Original published format: US 201762557786 P | [2020/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019055260 | Date: | 21.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3682196 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01C25/00, G06T7/80, G06T7/73 | [2021/38] | CPC: |
G06T7/80 (EP,US);
G01C25/00 (EP);
G06T7/73 (EP);
G06T2207/30244 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2020/30] | G01C25/00, G06T7/80 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/30] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR KALIBRIERUNG VON SENSOREN DER BILDGEBUNG UND RÄUMLICHEN AUSRICHTUNG | [2020/30] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR CALIBRATING IMAGING AND SPATIAL ORIENTATION SENSORS | [2020/30] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS D'ÉTALONNAGE DE CAPTEURS D'IMAGERIE ET D'ORIENTATION SPATIALE | [2020/30] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/30] | 21.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - KOK MANON ET AL, "Magnetometer Calibration Using Inertial Sensors", IEEE SENSORS JOURNAL, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 16, no. 14, doi:10.1109/JSEN.2016.2569160, ISSN 1530-437X, (20160701), pages 5679 - 5689, (20160616), XP011614611 [I] 1-3 * abstract * * sections I, IV, VI, VII-B * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JSEN.2016.2569160 | [I] - BONNET S ET AL, "Calibration methods for inertial and magnetic sensors", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS A: PHYSICAL, ELSEVIER BV, NL, vol. 156, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.SNA.2009.10.008, ISSN 0924-4247, (20091201), pages 302 - 311, (20091020), XP026778955 [I] 1-6 * abstract * * sections 1, 4, 4.2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.sna.2009.10.008 | International search | [A]US2011176129 (RASTEGAR JAHANGIR S [US]) [A] 1-6, 25, 26, 28 * entire document *; | [A]US2011275408 (KULIK VICTOR [US]) [A] 1-6, 25, 26, 28 * entire document *; | [A]US2012065928 (ROETVOLD OEYVIND [NO], et al) [A] 1-6, 25, 26, 28* entire document *; | [A]US2015178924 (CHAO HUI [US], et al) [A] 1-6, 25, 26, 28 * entire document *; | [A]US2016012589 (HAMER HENNING [DE], et al) [A] 1-6, 25, 26, 28 * entire document *; | [Y]US2016360997 (YADAV JAY [US], et al) [Y] 1-6, 28 * entire document *; | [XY]US2017153122 (TANG KETAN [CN], et al) [X] 25, 26 * entire document * [Y] 1-6, 28 | by applicant | - K. MANON et al., "Magnetometer Calibration Using Internal Sensors", IEEE Sensors Journal, (20160701), vol. 16, pages 5679 - 5689 | - S. BONNET et al., "Calibration methods for inertial and magnetic sensors", Sensors and Actuators A, (20090000), vol. 156, doi:10.1016/j.sna.2009.10.008, pages 302 - 311, XP026778955 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.sna.2009.10.008 |