EP3683937 - ROTATING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Minebea Mitsumi Inc. 4106-73 Oaza Miyota Miyota-machi Kitasaku-gun, Nagano 389-0293 / JP | [2020/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRABAYASHI, Koichiro c/o MINEBEA MITSUMI Inc. 4106-73 Oaza Miyota Miyota-machi Kitasaku-gun Nagano 389-0293 / JP | 02 /
MATSUMURA, Yukimasa c/o MINEBEA MITSUMI Inc. 4106-73 Oaza Miyota Miyota-machi Kitasaku-gun Nagano 389-0293 / JP | [2020/30] | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Eva Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2020/30] | Application number, filing date | 18856499.1 | 28.08.2018 | [2020/30] | WO2018JP31809 | Priority number, date | JP20170176231 | 13.09.2017 Original published format: JP 2017176231 | [2020/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019054174 | Date: | 21.03.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3683937 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H02K7/116, H02K11/21, H02K11/30, F16H1/06, F16H1/16, // H02K5/22 | [2021/21] | CPC: |
H02K7/1166 (EP,US);
H02K7/116 (CN);
F16H55/06 (US);
F16H57/02 (US);
H02K11/21 (EP,CN);
H02K11/23 (US);
H02K11/30 (EP,CN);
H02K5/225 (EP,US);
F16H1/06 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/30] | H02K7/116, F16H1/06, F16H1/16, H02K11/21, H02K11/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/30] | Title | German: | DREHVORRICHTUNG | [2020/30] | English: | ROTATING DEVICE | [2020/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF ROTATIF | [2020/30] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2020 | Translation filed | 18.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 18.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/30] | 17.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0926804 (EATON SA MONACO [MC]) [X] 1-5 * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0034]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0043]; figure 3 * [I] 6,7; | [X]JP2004166320 (ASMO CO LTD) [X] 1,2,8 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0032]; figures 4-8 * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0057] *; | [A]CN104517685 (NORTHWEST MACHINE CO LTD) [A] 1-8* abstract * | International search | [XY]JP2004166320 (ASMO CO LTD) [X] 1 * , * [Y] 2-8; | [Y]JP2014087140 (NIDEC SANKYO CORP) [Y] 2-8* , * | by applicant | JP2009261130 | JP2013005512 |