blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3536732

EP3536732 - POLYIMIDE PRECURSOR COMPOSITION AND POLYIMIDE FILM USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.10.2024
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.07.2024
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.07.2022
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.08.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.05.2025Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PL, RS
published on 04.06.2025 [2025/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Chem, Ltd.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 07336 / KR
[2019/37]
Inventor(s)01 / YUN, Cheolmin
LG Chem Research Park
188 Munji-ro
Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 34122 / KR
02 / KIM, Kyungjun
LG Chem Research Park
188 Munji-ro
Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 34122 / KR
 [2019/37]
Representative(s)Goddar, Heinz J.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[2019/37]
Application number, filing date18856647.509.07.2018
[2019/37]
WO2018KR07733
Priority number, dateKR2017011798914.09.2017         Original published format: KR 20170117989
[2019/37]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2019054612
Date:21.03.2019
Language:KO
[2019/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3536732
Date:11.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3536732
Date:06.11.2024
Language:EN
[2024/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR21.03.2019
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.03.2020
ClassificationIPC:C08G73/10, C08J5/18, G02F1/1333, H01L21/02
[2019/37]
CPC:
C08G73/1032 (EP,KR); C08G73/106 (EP,KR,US); C08G73/1075 (EP,KR);
C08J5/18 (EP,KR,US); G02F1/133305 (EP,KR); H01L21/02118 (EP,KR);
H10D86/411 (US); H10D86/60 (US); C08J2379/08 (US);
H10D86/423 (US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/37]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:POLYIMIDVORLÄUFERZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND POLYIMIDFOLIE DAMIT[2019/37]
English:POLYIMIDE PRECURSOR COMPOSITION AND POLYIMIDE FILM USING SAME[2019/37]
French:COMPOSITION DE PRÉCURSEUR DE POLYIMIDE ET FILM DE POLYIMIDE UTILISANT LADITE COMPOSITION[2019/37]
Entry into regional phase07.06.2019Translation filed 
07.06.2019National basic fee paid 
07.06.2019Search fee paid 
07.06.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
07.06.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.06.2019Examination requested  [2019/37]
29.09.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.07.2022Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.11.2022Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.07.2024Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.09.2024Fee for grant paid
25.09.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.09.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.07.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
22.07.2021Renewal fee patent year 04
25.07.2022Renewal fee patent year 05
25.07.2023Renewal fee patent year 06
23.07.2024Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT06.11.2024
BG06.11.2024
ES06.11.2024
FI06.11.2024
HR06.11.2024
LV06.11.2024
NL06.11.2024
PL06.11.2024
NO06.02.2025
RS06.02.2025
GR07.02.2025
IS06.03.2025
PT06.03.2025
[2025/23]
Former [2025/22]AT06.11.2024
BG06.11.2024
ES06.11.2024
FI06.11.2024
HR06.11.2024
LV06.11.2024
NL06.11.2024
NO06.02.2025
GR07.02.2025
IS06.03.2025
PT06.03.2025
Former [2025/21]BG06.11.2024
ES06.11.2024
FI06.11.2024
HR06.11.2024
NL06.11.2024
IS06.03.2025
PT06.03.2025
Documents cited:Search[I]US2017096530  (YUN CHEOLMIN [KR], et al)
International search[A]US2009088551  (YAMASHITA SHINSUKE [JP], et al);
 [A]KR20160067413  (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]);
 [A]KR20160097685  (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]);
 [A]KR20160108252  (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]);
 [A]KR20170057458  (UNITIKA LTD [JP]);
 [A]JP2017119868  (DONGJIN SEMICHEM CO LTD);
 [PX]KR101840977B  (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR])
by applicantKR20170117989
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.