EP3657622 - PHOTOVOLTAIC POWER OPTIMIZER AND CONTROL METHOD AND APPARATUS THEREFOR, AND PHOTOVOLTAIC POWER GENERATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Digital Power Technologies Co., Ltd. Office 01, 39th Floor, Block A Antuoshan Headquarters Towers 33 Antuoshan 6th Road Futian District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518043 / CN | [2021/50] |
Former [2020/22] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Feng Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Chengyong Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
JIANG, Chengfeng Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2020/22] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2020/22] | Application number, filing date | 18856905.7 | 03.09.2018 | [2020/22] | WO2018CN103748 | Priority number, date | CN201710834910 | 15.09.2017 Original published format: CN201710834910 | [2020/22] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019052358 | Date: | 21.03.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3657622 | Date: | 27.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3657622 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/38, H02J3/00, H02M3/158 | [2020/22] | CPC: |
H02J3/381 (EP,US);
H02J3/0012 (EP);
H02M3/1582 (EP);
H02J2300/24 (EP);
H02J2300/26 (EP,US);
H02M1/32 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTIMIERER VON PHOTOVOLTAISCHEM STROM UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR UND SYSTEM ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON PHOTOVOLTAISCHEM STROM | [2020/22] | English: | PHOTOVOLTAIC POWER OPTIMIZER AND CONTROL METHOD AND APPARATUS THEREFOR, AND PHOTOVOLTAIC POWER GENERATION SYSTEM | [2020/22] | French: | OPTIMISEUR DE PUISSANCE PHOTOVOLTAÏQUE AINSI QUE PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE ET APPAREIL ASSOCIÉ, ET SYSTÈME DE GÉNÉRATION DE PUISSANCE PHOTOVOLTAÏQUE | [2020/22] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2020 | Translation filed | 17.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2020 | Search fee paid | 17.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/22] | 15.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.11.2023 | CZ | 08.11.2023 | DK | 08.11.2023 | EE | 08.11.2023 | ES | 08.11.2023 | HR | 08.11.2023 | IT | 08.11.2023 | LT | 08.11.2023 | LV | 08.11.2023 | NL | 08.11.2023 | PL | 08.11.2023 | RO | 08.11.2023 | RS | 08.11.2023 | SE | 08.11.2023 | SK | 08.11.2023 | SM | 08.11.2023 | BG | 08.02.2024 | NO | 08.02.2024 | GR | 09.02.2024 | IS | 08.03.2024 | PT | 08.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
CZ | 08.11.2023 | ||
DK | 08.11.2023 | ||
EE | 08.11.2023 | ||
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RO | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
SM | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
DK | 08.11.2023 | ||
EE | 08.11.2023 | ||
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
SM | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
DK | 08.11.2023 | ||
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
SM | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 08.11.2023 | |
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 09.02.2024 | |
IS | 08.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2010063244 (SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES) [Y] 8* the whole document *; | [Y]US2011285375 (DEBOY GERALD [AT]) [Y] 3,5 * the whole document *; | [IY]US2013328404 (NOSAKA SHIGEKIYO [JP], et al) [I] 1,2,4,6,7,9-15 * the whole document * [Y] 3,5,8 |