EP3687854 - HEIGHT ADJUSTMENT MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB, IE | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Martur Sünger ve Koltuk Tesisleri Ticaret ve Sanayi Anonim Sirketi Organiza Sanayi Bolgesi Kahverengi Caddesi No. 9 Bursa / TR | [2020/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOGAN, Anil Organize Sanayi Bolgesi Kahverengi Cad. No:9 Bursa / TR | 02 /
SACAR, Ismail Organize Sanayi Bolgesi Kahverengi Cad. No:9 Bursa / TR | 03 /
DAL, Murat Organize Sanayi Bolgesi Kahverengi Cad. No:9 Bursa / TR | 04 /
KURT, Recep Organize Sanayi Bolgesi Kahverengi Cad. No:9 Bursa / TR | 05 /
DEVECI, Omer Osman Organize Sanayi Bolgesi Kahverengi Cad. No:9 Bursa / TR | [2020/32] | Representative(s) | Demirkiran, Hasan Kordinat Inovasyon ve Fikri Mulkiyet Yonetimi Ltd. Sti. Nispetiye Mah. Nispetiye Cad. No:6 K:2 Etiler Besiktas 34340 Istanbul / TR | [2020/32] | Application number, filing date | 18858136.7 | 17.09.2018 | [2020/32] | WO2018TR50500 | Priority number, date | TR20170013874 | 19.09.2017 Original published format: TR 201713874 | TR20180012903 | 07.09.2018 Original published format: TR 201812903 | [2020/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2019059865 | Date: | 28.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3687854 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3687854 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | TR | 19.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/16, B60N2/90 | [2020/32] | CPC: |
B60N2/165 (EP);
B60N2/167 (EP);
B60N2/168 (EP);
B60N2/938 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HÖHENVERSTELLMECHANISMUS | [2020/32] | English: | HEIGHT ADJUSTMENT MECHANISM | [2020/32] | French: | MÉCANISME DE RÉGLAGE EN HAUTEUR | [2020/32] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 13.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/32] | 08.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the invitation to file a copy of earlier search results or a statement of non-availability not received in time | 28.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/49] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to file a copy of earlier search results or a statement of non-availability | 01.04.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 01.04.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.04.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 28.12.2022 | AT | 28.12.2022 | CZ | 28.12.2022 | DK | 28.12.2022 | EE | 28.12.2022 | ES | 28.12.2022 | FI | 28.12.2022 | HR | 28.12.2022 | LT | 28.12.2022 | LV | 28.12.2022 | MC | 28.12.2022 | NL | 28.12.2022 | PL | 28.12.2022 | RO | 28.12.2022 | RS | 28.12.2022 | SE | 28.12.2022 | SI | 28.12.2022 | SK | 28.12.2022 | SM | 28.12.2022 | NO | 28.03.2023 | GR | 29.03.2023 | IS | 28.04.2023 | PT | 28.04.2023 | GB | 17.09.2023 | IE | 17.09.2023 | LU | 17.09.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/28] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
DK | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
MC | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SI | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
LU | 17.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
DK | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SI | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
LU | 17.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
DK | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SI | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
DK | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 28.12.2022 | |
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | EE | 28.12.2022 | |
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 28.12.2022 | |
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 28.12.2022 | |
NO | 28.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP1867518 (FAURECIA SIEGES AUTOMOBILE [FR]) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraph [0036]; figure 2 * [A] 5; | [A]JP2014185669 (TS TECH CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * * figure 2 *; | [A]US2017253148 (CHAE SOO YOUNG [KR]) [A] 1 * abstract ** figure 1 * | International search | [X]US2003173182 (KIM JAE HO [KR]) [X] 1-4 * Abstract; paragraphs 36-55; figures 2-8 *; | [A]US2012112508 (RICHARD DENIS [FR], et al) [A] 1-4 * Abstract; paragraphs 38, 52-59, 79-86; figure 4,5, 7-9 *; | [A]WO2014020284 (FAURECIA SIEGES AUTOMOBILE) [A] 1-4* Abstract; figure 5 * |