EP3684511 - DEMARCATION TEMPLATE FOR HAZARDOUS CONTAMINANT TESTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becton, Dickinson and Company 1 Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417 / US | [2020/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSHINSKI, Matthew 1 Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, New Jersey 07417 / US | 02 /
MCKINNON, Austin, Jason 1 Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, New Jersey 07417 / US | [2020/31] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2020/31] | Application number, filing date | 18858432.0 | 18.09.2018 | [2020/31] | WO2018US51440 | Priority number, date | US201762561557P | 21.09.2017 Original published format: US 201762561557 P | [2020/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019060275 | Date: | 28.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3684511 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00, G01D11/24, G01N1/28, G01N1/31, G01N21/88, G03F9/00, B01L9/00, G01N1/02, G01N1/38, G01N21/78, G01N21/84 | [2021/25] | CPC: |
G01N1/02 (EP,US);
B01L9/56 (EP,US);
G01N33/15 (US);
B01L3/5023 (EP,US);
B01L3/5029 (EP,US);
G01N1/38 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/31] | B01L3/00, G01D11/24, G01N1/28, G01N1/31, G01N21/88, G03F9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/31] | Title | German: | ABGRENZUNGSSCHABLONE ZUM TESTEN GEFÄHRLICHER KONTAMINANTEN | [2020/31] | English: | DEMARCATION TEMPLATE FOR HAZARDOUS CONTAMINANT TESTING | [2020/31] | French: | GABARIT DE DÉMARCATION POUR TEST DE CONTAMINANT DANGEREUX | [2020/31] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/31] | 20.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2012282154 (SLOWEY PAUL D [US], et al) [Y] 2,4,11 * figure 2 * * paragraphs [0107] , [0126] *; | [XY]US2017016045 (MCDANIEL JEFFERSON SCOTT [US]) [X] 1,3,12-18 * figures 1-2 * * paragraphs [0017] , [0022] , [0027] , [0025] , [0031] - [0032] - [0033] - [0034] - [0035] - [3643] * [Y] 2,4,11; | [A] - National Infection Service, "Detection and enumeration of bacteria in swabs and other environmental samples National Infection Service Food Water and Environmental Microbiology Standard Method", (20170901), URL: https://assets.publishing.service.gov.uk/government/uploads/system/uploads/attachment_data/file/660648/Detection_and_enumeration_of_bacteria_in_swabs_and_other_environmental_samples.pdf, (20200716), XP055715613 [A] 1-18 * page 20 * * figure 1 * | International search | [A]US4724307 (DUTTON CLIFTON C [US], et al) [A] 1-8, 10-15, 17-23* , col 3, In 65 to col 4, In 35; col 4, In 63 to col 5, In 68 *; | [A]US5511934 (BACCHI PAUL E [US], et al) [A] 1-8,10-15, 17-23 * , col 2, In 8-52; col 3, In 21-58 *; | [YA]US2012282154 (SLOWEY PAUL D [US], et al) [Y] 9, 16 * , Figs. 2, 4, 5; para [0006], [0041], [0107], [0120], [0121], [0126] * [A] 1-8, 10-15, 17-23; | [YA]US2016077013 (ATTAR AMIR JAMES [US], et al) [Y] 9, 16 * , Figs. 3D, 4A, 4C; para [0017], [0018], [0020], [0021], [0044], [0065], [0102], [0106], [0109] * [A] 1-8, 10-15, 17-23; | [A]US2016258874 (TRUEX BRYAN I [US]) [A] 1-8, 10-15, 17-23 * , para [0054], [0055] * | by applicant | US2012282154 | US2017016045 |