EP3683244 - SOLVENT-FREE PHOTO-CURABLE RESIN COMPOSITION FOR POLARIZING PLATE PROTECTIVE LAYER, POLARIZING PLATE COMPRISING CURED PRODUCT THEREOF, AND IMAGE DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shanjin Optoelectronics (Nanjing) Co., LTD. 11 Hengyi Road Nanjing Economic Development Zone Qixia District Nanjing, Jiangsu 210038 / CN | [2023/46] |
Former [2021/34] | For all designated states Shanjin Optoelectronics (Suzhou) Co., LTD. Room 1, 2, and 3, No. 2 Tangqiao Middle Road Tangshi street Yangshe Town Zhangjiagang City Suzhou, Jiangsu, 215699 / CN | ||
Former [2020/30] | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 128 Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Mi So c/o LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
KWON, Yoonkyung c/o LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
HAN, Sanghun c/o LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2023/26] |
Former [2020/30] | 01 /
LEE, Mi So LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | ||
02 /
KWON, Yoonkyung LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | |||
03 /
HAN, Sanghun LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | Representative(s) | Wang, Bo Panovision IP Ebersberger Straße 3 85570 Markt Schwaben / DE | [2023/26] |
Former [2020/30] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 18858495.7 | 20.09.2018 | [2020/30] | WO2018KR11188 | Priority number, date | KR20170122715 | 22.09.2017 Original published format: KR 20170122715 | [2020/30] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2019059693 | Date: | 28.03.2019 | Language: | KO | [2019/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3683244 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3683244 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 09.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C08F20/18, C08F2/50, C08G18/10, C08G18/81, G02B5/30, G02F1/1335, C08F220/18, C09D133/08 | [2020/43] | CPC: |
C08F220/1811 (EP);
C08F20/18 (EP,KR,US);
G02F1/133528 (EP,KR,US);
C08F2/50 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/10 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/8175 (EP,KR,US);
C09D133/08 (EP);
G02B5/30 (EP,KR,US);
G02B5/3016 (US);
C08K3/013 (US);
C08K5/0016 (US);
C08K5/005 (US);
C09K2323/03 (US);
C09K2323/031 (US);
C09K2323/035 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08F220/1811, C08F220/20 (EP);
C09D133/08, C08K5/0025 (EP) |
Former IPC [2020/30] | C08F20/18, C08F2/50, C08G18/10, C08G18/81, G02B5/30, G02F1/1335 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LÖSUNGSMITTELFREIE LICHTHÄRTBARE HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR POLARISIERENDE PLATTENSCHUTZSCHICHT, POLARISIERENDE PLATTE MIT GEHÄRTETEM PRODUKT DAVON UND BILDANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2020/30] | English: | SOLVENT-FREE PHOTO-CURABLE RESIN COMPOSITION FOR POLARIZING PLATE PROTECTIVE LAYER, POLARIZING PLATE COMPRISING CURED PRODUCT THEREOF, AND IMAGE DISPLAY DEVICE | [2020/30] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE PHOTODURCISSABLE SANS SOLVANT POUR COUCHE DE PROTECTION DE PLAQUE DE POLARISATION, PLAQUE DE POLARISATION COMPRENANT UN PRODUIT DURCI DE CELLE-CI, ET DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE D'IMAGE | [2020/30] | Entry into regional phase | 16.04.2020 | Translation filed | 16.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 16.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/30] | 05.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 06.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/23] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 06.01.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 06.01.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.01.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.06.2023 | CZ | 28.06.2023 | DK | 28.06.2023 | EE | 28.06.2023 | ES | 28.06.2023 | FI | 28.06.2023 | HR | 28.06.2023 | IT | 28.06.2023 | LT | 28.06.2023 | LV | 28.06.2023 | MC | 28.06.2023 | NL | 28.06.2023 | PL | 28.06.2023 | RO | 28.06.2023 | RS | 28.06.2023 | SE | 28.06.2023 | SI | 28.06.2023 | SK | 28.06.2023 | SM | 28.06.2023 | IE | 20.09.2023 | LU | 20.09.2023 | NO | 28.09.2023 | GR | 29.09.2023 | BE | 30.09.2023 | CH | 30.09.2023 | IS | 28.10.2023 | PT | 30.10.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 28.06.2023 | |
CZ | 28.06.2023 | ||
DK | 28.06.2023 | ||
EE | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
IT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
MC | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
PL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RO | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
IE | 20.09.2023 | ||
LU | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
CH | 30.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
PT | 30.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 28.06.2023 | |
CZ | 28.06.2023 | ||
DK | 28.06.2023 | ||
EE | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
IT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
MC | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
PL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RO | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
IE | 20.09.2023 | ||
LU | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
PT | 30.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 28.06.2023 | |
CZ | 28.06.2023 | ||
DK | 28.06.2023 | ||
EE | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
IT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
MC | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
PL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RO | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
LU | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
PT | 30.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 28.06.2023 | |
CZ | 28.06.2023 | ||
DK | 28.06.2023 | ||
EE | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
IT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
PL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RO | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
LU | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
PT | 30.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 28.06.2023 | |
CZ | 28.06.2023 | ||
DK | 28.06.2023 | ||
EE | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
PL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RO | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
LU | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
PT | 30.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 28.06.2023 | |
CZ | 28.06.2023 | ||
DK | 28.06.2023 | ||
EE | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
PL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RO | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
PT | 30.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 28.06.2023 | |
CZ | 28.06.2023 | ||
EE | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
PL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RO | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
PT | 30.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 28.06.2023 | |
CZ | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | FI | 28.06.2023 | |
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | FI | 28.06.2023 | |
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | HR | 28.06.2023 | |
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | HR | 28.06.2023 | |
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 28.06.2023 | |
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | SE | 28.06.2023 | |
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | SE | 28.06.2023 | |
NO | 28.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2013256552 (SOKEN KAGAKU KK) [X] 1-5,9,11 * example 2 *; | [X]JP5501659B (LINTEC CORP) [X] 1-15* paragraph [0046]; example 6A and 6B * | International search | [Y]KR20070111352 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-18 * See claims 1, 13, paragraphs [0037] to [0112], [0131], [0160] to [0166]. *; | [Y]KR20080080528 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-18* See claims 1, 15, paragraphs [0094] to [0132], [0169] to [0175]. *; | [Y]KR20130099422 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [Y] 13 * See paragraphs [0026] to [0028] *; | [Y]KR20150094664 (TOAGOSEI CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-18 * See paragraphs [0097] to [0122], [0212] to [0239]. *; | [Y]KR20160096403 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [Y] 4-7, 10-12, 14 * See paragraphs [0063] to [0141], table 1. * | by applicant | JP2000230016 | JP2001151814 | JP2002120326 | KR20090115040 | KR20170122715 |