EP3687191 - ULTRASONIC SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-8555 / JP | [2020/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATO, Takehiro c/o MURATA MANUFACTURING Co., Ltd. 10-1 Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto 617-8555 / JP | [2020/31] | Representative(s) | Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/31] | Reeve, Nicholas Edward Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 18858712.5 | 21.08.2018 | [2020/31] | WO2018JP30840 | Priority number, date | JP20170181380 | 21.09.2017 Original published format: JP 2017181380 | [2020/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019058842 | Date: | 28.03.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3687191 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3687191 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/521, G01S15/931, H04R17/00 | [2021/24] | CPC: |
G01S7/521 (EP,US);
G01S15/931 (EP,US);
H04R17/00 (EP);
G01S2015/938 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2020/31] | H04R17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ULTRASCHALLSENSOR | [2020/31] | English: | ULTRASONIC SENSOR | [2020/31] | French: | CAPTEUR ULTRASONORE | [2020/31] | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2020 | Translation filed | 03.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 03.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/31] | 06.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2001078296 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [X] 1-3,5 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0031] * [I] 4; | [XI]JP2001232294 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [X] 1-3,5 * abstract * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0100] - paragraph [0101] *[I] 4 | International search | [A]JP2002112395 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [A] 1-5 * , *; | [A]JP2002262383 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [A] 1-5* , * | by applicant | JP2002209294 |