EP3667489 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MANAGING APPLICATION PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LV | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2020/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIN, Weisheng Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2020/25] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2020/25] | Application number, filing date | 18858905.5 | 04.09.2018 | [2020/25] | WO2018CN104025 | Priority number, date | CN201710852528 | 19.09.2017 Original published format: CN201710852528 | [2020/25] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019056943 | Date: | 28.03.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3667489 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3667489 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 28.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F8/61, G06F8/65, G06F9/445, H04W36/00 | [2020/46] | CPC: |
H04W36/0011 (EP);
G06F8/61 (EP,CN);
G06F9/548 (US);
G06F8/65 (EP,CN);
G06F9/445 (EP);
G06F9/44505 (US);
G06F9/44526 (CN);
G06F9/44584 (US);
G06F9/54 (EP);
G06F9/547 (CN)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/25] | G06F8/61, G06F8/65, G06F9/445 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERWALTUNG EINES ANWENDUNGSPROGRAMMS | [2020/25] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MANAGING APPLICATION PROGRAM | [2020/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE GESTION DE PROGRAMME D'APPLICATION | [2020/25] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2020 | Translation filed | 11.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 11.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/25] | 10.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.11.2023 | ES | 08.11.2023 | HR | 08.11.2023 | LT | 08.11.2023 | LV | 08.11.2023 | NL | 08.11.2023 | PL | 08.11.2023 | RS | 08.11.2023 | SE | 08.11.2023 | BG | 08.02.2024 | NO | 08.02.2024 | GR | 09.02.2024 | IS | 08.03.2024 | PT | 08.03.2024 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 08.11.2023 | |
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 09.02.2024 | |
IS | 08.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2017091960 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]WO2017091934 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]WO2017129742 (NOKIA SOLUTIONS & NETWORKS OY [FI]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1, line 26 - page 4, line 24 * * page 7, line 16 - page 10, line 25 * * page 11, line 5 - page 17, line 31 * * page 18, line 30 - page 21, line 17 ** figures 1-9; claims 1-25 *; | [E]EP3373523 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [E] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0092] * * paragraph [0096] - paragraph [0106] * * paragraph [0109] - paragraph [0122] * * paragraph [0124] - paragraph [0131] * * paragraph [0135] - paragraph [0144] * * figures 1-12; claims 1-34 *; | EP3373542 [ ] (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [ ] * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0099] * * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0116] * * paragraph [0118] - paragraph [0128] * * paragraph [0144] - paragraph [0153] * * figures 1-12; claims 1-30 * | Examination | - Huawei : Milan ET AL, "Mobile-Edge Computing - Introductory Technical White Paper Issue 1 Mobile-Edge Computing Contributing Organizations and Authors Table of Contents", (20140901), URL: https://portal.etsi.org/Portals/0/TBpages/MEC/Docs/Mobile-edge_Computing_-_Introductory_Technical_White_Paper_V1 18-09-14.pdf, (20160920), XP055303917 | - Yun Chao Hu ET AL, "Mobile Edge Computing A key technology towards 5G", Sophia Antipolis, ISBN 979-10-92-62008-5, (20150901), URL: https://www.etsi.org/images/files/ETSIWhitePapers/etsi_wp11_mec_a_key_technology_towards_5g.pdf, (20181212), XP055533153 |