EP3641364 - DATA PROCESSING METHOD AND RELATED DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.03.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.04.2022 [2022/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2020/17] | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANG, Hai NO.18 Haibin Road Wusha Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2020/17] | Representative(s) | Penza, Giancarlo Bugnion S.p.A. Viale Lancetti, 17 20158 Milano / IT | [2020/17] | Application number, filing date | 18858937.8 | 11.01.2018 | [2020/17] | WO2018CN72248 | Priority number, date | WO2017CN103022 | 22.09.2017 Original published format: PCT/CN2017/103022 | [2020/17] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019056666 | Date: | 28.03.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3641364 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 28.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W8/24, H04W68/00 | [2020/17] | CPC: |
H04W8/245 (EP,KR);
H04W72/23 (US);
H04L1/08 (EP);
H04L1/18 (EP);
H04L45/24 (US);
H04L5/0091 (EP);
H04W28/06 (KR);
H04W68/00 (EP);
H04W76/11 (US);
H04W76/15 (KR,US);
H04W8/24 (EP);
H04W80/02 (US);
H04L5/001 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/17] | Title | German: | DATENVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNG | [2020/17] | English: | DATA PROCESSING METHOD AND RELATED DEVICE | [2020/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES ET DISPOSITIF ASSOCIÉ | [2020/17] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2020 | Translation filed | 16.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 16.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/17] | 11.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2015115854 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 4-6,27 ** paragraph [0285] - paragraph [0292] *; | [X] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Design of MAC CE for duplicate activation/deactivation", vol. RAN WG2, no. Berlin, Germany; 20170821 - 20170825, (20170820), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1707712 DESIGN OF MAC CE FOR DUPLICATE ACTIVATION DEACTIVATION, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20170820), XP051317673 [X] 1-15 * figures 1-2 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * | [XA] - ERICSSON, "MAC CE details for activation and deactivation of PDCP data duplication", vol. RAN WG2, no. Berlin, Germany; 20170821 - 20170825, (20170820), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1708331 - MAC CE DETAILS FOR PDCP DATA ACTIVATION AND DEACTIVATION, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPO, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20170820), XP051318214 [X] 1,14,15 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * [A] 9-13 | [XA] - SAMSUNG, "MAC CE for Activation/Deactivation of PDCP Duplication", vol. RAN WG2, no. Berlin, Germany; 20170821 - 20170825, (20170820), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1709029 MAC CE FOR DUPLICATION ACTIVATION, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20170820), XP051318822 [X] 1,14,15 * figures 6.1.3.x-1 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0004] * [A] 2-13 | International search | [A]CN104144484 (ALCATEL LUCENT, et al) [A] 1-20; | [A]CN104602294 (ALCATEL LUCENT SHANGHAI BELL, et al)[A] 1-20; | [X]CN105323852 (ZTE CORP) [X] 1-20; | [X]CN105659690 (LG ELECTRONICS INC) [X] 1-20; | [X]CN107147479 (CHINA ACADEMY TELECOMMUNICATIONS TECHNOLOGY) [X] 1-20 |