EP3684704 - SPOUT SEAL FOR A CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.09.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Puratap Pty Ltd 14-16 Stepney Street Stepney, South Australia 5069 / AU | [2023/33] |
Former [2020/31] | For all designated states Puratap Pty Ltd 14-16 Stepney Street Stepney, South Australia 5069 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEARCE, Scott Unit 2, 29 Aldenhaven Road Lonsdale, South Autralia 5160 / AU | [2020/31] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2023/33] |
Former [2020/31] | Burrows, Anthony Gregory Business Centre West Avenue One, Business Park Letchworth Garden City, Hertfordshire SG6 2HB / GB | Application number, filing date | 18859017.8 | 14.09.2018 | [2020/31] | WO2018AU51011 | Priority number, date | AU20170903811 | 19.09.2017 Original published format: AU 2017903811 | [2020/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019056056 | Date: | 28.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3684704 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3684704 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 28.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B65D47/28, B65D47/06 | [2020/31] | CPC: |
B65D47/063 (EP,US);
B65D47/28 (EP);
B65D47/283 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TÜLLENVERSCHLUSS FÜR EINEN BEHÄLTER | [2020/31] | English: | SPOUT SEAL FOR A CONTAINER | [2020/31] | French: | JOINT D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ DE BEC VERSEUR DESTINÉ À UN CONTENANT | [2020/31] | Entry into regional phase | 16.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.2020 | Search fee paid | 16.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 16.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/31] | 27.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 16.08.2023 | ES | 16.08.2023 | HR | 16.08.2023 | MC | 16.08.2023 | PL | 16.08.2023 | RO | 16.08.2023 | RS | 16.08.2023 | SK | 16.08.2023 | SM | 16.08.2023 | IE | 14.09.2023 | NO | 16.11.2023 | GR | 17.11.2023 | IS | 16.12.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/28] | CZ | 16.08.2023 | |
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
MC | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 16.08.2023 | |
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 16.08.2023 | |
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 16.08.2023 | |
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 16.11.2023 | |
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 16.11.2023 | |
GR | 17.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH09226802 (YOSHINO KOGYOSHO CO LTD) [Y] 14,15* paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0022]; figures 1-2 *; | [XYI]FR2895732 (SEAQUIST GENERAL PLASTICS SOC [FR]) [X] 1-7,10 * page 2 - page 7; figures 1-2 * [Y] 14,15 [I] 8,9,11-13 | International search | [X]US3203665 (GRANT EDWARD J, et al) [X] 1-3, 11-13 * Figures 3-4; Column 2, Line 67 - Column 3, Line 12 *; | [X]WO9521776 (ARNONE ALPHONSE [FR], et al) [X] 1-3, 11-13 * Abstract; Figures 2-3 *; | [X]JPH09226802 (YOSHINO KOGYOSHO CO LTD) [X] 1-15 * Abstract; Figures 1 - 2 *; | [A]WO2016044890 (PURATAP PTY LTD [AU]) [A] 1-15* Figures 2b, 4b, 10a, 10b; Page 17, Lines 19 - 20 * | Examination | WO2016044890 | by applicant | US7533783 | US2011198361 | US8701906 | WO2015AU50567 | WO2018AU50293 |