EP3685836 - BONE REMODELING ACCELERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.06.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hokuriku University 1-1 Taiyogaoka Kanazawa-shi, Ishikawa 920-1180 / JP | [2020/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIURA, Masakazu c/o HOKURIKU UNIVERSITY Ho-3 Kanagawa-machi Kanazawa-shi Ishikawa 920-1181 / JP | 02 /
TAKAHASHI, Tatsuo c/o HOKURIKU UNIVERSITY Ho-3 Kanagawa-machi Kanazawa-shi Ishikawa 920-1181 / JP | 03 /
SUZUKI, Hirokazu c/o HOKURIKU UNIVERSITY Ho-3 Kanagawa-machi Kanazawa-shi Ishikawa 920-1181 / JP | 04 /
KAWATA, Yukio c/o HOKURIKU UNIVERSITY Ho-3 Kanagawa-machi Kanazawa-shi Ishikawa 920-1181 / JP | 05 /
KITADE, Shoko c/o HOKURIKU UNIVERSITY Ho-3 Kanagawa-machi Kanazawa-shi Ishikawa 920-1181 / JP | 06 /
TAKENAKA, Mako c/o HOKURIKU UNIVERSITY Ho-3 Kanagawa-machi Kanazawa-shi Ishikawa 920-1181 / JP | 07 /
OHMOTO, Masanori c/o HOKURIKU UNIVERSITY Ho-3 Kanagawa-machi Kanazawa-shi Ishikawa 920-1181 / JP | 08 /
SATO, Yuki c/o HOKURIKU UNIVERSITY Ho-3 Kanagawa-machi Kanazawa-shi Ishikawa 920-1181 / JP | [2020/31] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/31] | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18859747.0 | 20.09.2018 | [2020/31] | WO2018JP34808 | Priority number, date | JP20170181670 | 21.09.2017 Original published format: JP 2017181670 | [2020/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019059275 | Date: | 28.03.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3685836 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/366, A23L33/105, A61K31/7034, A61K36/482, A61P19/08, A61P19/10 | [2020/31] | CPC: |
A61K31/352 (EP);
A61K36/48 (EP,US);
A23L33/105 (EP);
A61K31/353 (US);
A61K31/7034 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/31] | Title | German: | KNOCHENNEUMODELLIERUNGSBESCHLEUNIGER | [2020/31] | English: | BONE REMODELING ACCELERATOR | [2020/31] | French: | ACCÉLÉRATEUR DE REMODELAGE OSSEUX | [2020/31] | Entry into regional phase | 03.04.2020 | Translation filed | 03.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 03.04.2020 | Search fee paid | 03.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/31] | 24.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2002234844 ; | [X]JP2001072598 ; | [I]JP2003026572 ; | [I]US4617293 (WAHLIG HELMUT [DE], et al); | [I]US2014213535 (MAURYA RAKESH [IN], et al); | International search | [XA]JP2001072598 (LOTTE CO LTD) [X] 1, 2, 5, 6 * , * [A] 3, 4; | [XA]JP2003026572 (HAYASHIBARA BIOCHEM LAB) [X] 1, 5, 6 * , * [A] 2, 3, 4; | [XA] - HABAUZIT, V. et al., "Differential effects of two citrus flavanones on bone quality in senescent male rats in relation to their bioavailability and metabolism.", Bone, (20110000), vol. 49, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1016/j.bone.2011.07.030, pages 1108 - 1116, XP028322725 [X] 1, 5, 6 * , Abstract, Fig * [A] 2, 3, 4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bone.2011.07.030 | [XA] - WANG, X. L. et al., "Effects of Eleven Flavonoids from the Osteoprotective Fraction of Drynaria fortunei (KUNZE) J. SM. on Osteoblastic Proliferation Using an Osteoblast-Like Cell Line", Chem. Pharm. Bull., (20080000), vol. 56, no. 1, XP009118209 [X] 1, 5, 6 * , * [A] 2, 3, 4 | by applicant | JP2001072598 | JP2013184961 | JP2014001201 | JP2014152129 | JP2015181366 | JP2015182960 |