EP3686508 - CEILING-MOUNTED INDOOR UNIT FOR AIR CONDITIONER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2020/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Sujung 51 Gasan digital 1 ro Geumchun-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 02 /
YUN, Hyeongnam 51 Gasan digital 1 ro Geumchun-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | [2020/31] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2020/31] | Application number, filing date | 18859846.0 | 20.09.2018 | [2020/31] | WO2018KR11164 | Priority number, date | KR20170121408 | 20.09.2017 Original published format: KR 20170121408 | [2020/31] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019059682 | Date: | 28.03.2019 | Language: | KO | [2019/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3686508 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3686508 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F24F13/14, F24F1/00, F24F11/65, F24H4/06, F24F11/61, F24F1/0011, F24F1/0047, F24F11/79, F24F13/06 | [2021/47] | CPC: |
F24F1/0011 (EP,KR);
F24F13/1426 (KR);
F24F1/0047 (EP);
F24F11/61 (EP);
F24F11/65 (EP);
F24F11/79 (EP);
F24F13/14 (EP);
F24F13/1413 (EP);
F24F13/06 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/31] | F24F13/14, F24F1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DECKENMONTIERTE INNENRAUMEINHEIT FÜR EINE KLIMAANLAGE | [2020/31] | English: | CEILING-MOUNTED INDOOR UNIT FOR AIR CONDITIONER | [2020/31] | French: | UNITÉ INTÉRIEURE MONTÉE AU PLAFOND, POUR CLIMATISEUR | [2020/31] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2020 | Translation filed | 20.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2020 | Search fee paid | 20.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/31] | 16.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23210488.5 / EP4321818 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.11.2023 | CZ | 22.11.2023 | DK | 22.11.2023 | EE | 22.11.2023 | ES | 22.11.2023 | HR | 22.11.2023 | IT | 22.11.2023 | LT | 22.11.2023 | LV | 22.11.2023 | NL | 22.11.2023 | PL | 22.11.2023 | RO | 22.11.2023 | RS | 22.11.2023 | SE | 22.11.2023 | SK | 22.11.2023 | SM | 22.11.2023 | BG | 22.02.2024 | NO | 22.02.2024 | GR | 23.02.2024 | IS | 22.03.2024 | PT | 22.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
CZ | 22.11.2023 | ||
DK | 22.11.2023 | ||
EE | 22.11.2023 | ||
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RO | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
DK | 22.11.2023 | ||
EE | 22.11.2023 | ||
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
DK | 22.11.2023 | ||
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 22.11.2023 | |
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 23.02.2024 | |
IS | 22.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2015068603 (DAIKIN IND LTD); | [A]EP3029385 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]); | [A]KR20160101848 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) | International search | [A]JP2009222302 (PANASONIC CORP); | [A]JP2010060223 (SHARP KK); | [A]KR20110057458 (KIM SOON CHEUL [KR]); | [A]KR20140101284 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]); | [A]KR20170000386 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) | by applicant | KR100679838B |