EP3675779 - URINARY CATHETER BRIDGING DEVICE, SYSTEMS AND METHODS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.04.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C.R. Bard, Inc. 730 Central Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974 / US | [2020/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRINKLEY, Micah 515 Oakridge Trl. St. Augustine, FL 32092 / US | [2020/28] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/28] | Application number, filing date | 18859862.7 | 18.09.2018 | [2020/28] | WO2018US51550 | Priority number, date | US201762560513P | 19.09.2017 Original published format: US 201762560513 P | [2020/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019060309 | Date: | 28.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3675779 | Date: | 08.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/453, A61F5/44, A61M5/14 | [2020/28] | CPC: |
A61M5/1418 (EP);
A61F5/453 (EP,US);
A61F5/4408 (US);
A61M25/02 (US);
A61F5/44 (EP);
A61M2025/026 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/28] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERBRÜCKUNG VON HARNKATHETERN, SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2020/28] | English: | URINARY CATHETER BRIDGING DEVICE, SYSTEMS AND METHODS THEREOF | [2020/28] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PONTAGE DE CATHÉTER URINAIRE, SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2020/28] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/28] | 11.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]DE3201539 (HORNUNG WILHELM) [X] 1-4,8 * the whole document * [Y] 5-7 [I] 9-15; | [XYI]US2007239121 (TULLY STEPHEN [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * figures 2-8 * [Y] 5-7 [I] 8-15; | [Y]US2011130728 (MCKINNON AUSTIN JASON [US]) [Y] 5-7 * paragraphs [0079] - [0082] * * figures 16-19 *; | [A]WO2015057999 (BARD INC C R [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0008] ** figures 1,2 *; | [Y]WO2016126555 (BARD INC C R [US]) [Y] 5-7 * paragraph [0061] * * figure 2 *; | [XYI]US2017021135 (ENGELHARDT BERNARD [CA]) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0130] * * figures 1, 2A,B * [Y] 5-7 [I] 8-15 | International search | [A]US5312383 (KUBALAK THOMAS P [US]) [A] 1-3, 11-16, 19-20 * ; entire document. *; | [A]US5752944 (DANN JEFFREY A [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 11-16, 19-20* ; entire document. *; | [YA]US6068618 (ANDERSON VERNE M [US]) [Y] 11-14, 16 * ; entire document, especially Abstract, Fig. 1-2; col. 5, In 3-29; col. 5, In 66- col. 6, In 18.; entire document, especially Fig. 2-3, col. 3, In 26-29. * [A] 15; | [Y]WO03022333 (CHENG GORDON C [US], et al) [Y] 1-3, 11, 19-20 * ; entire document, especially Figs. 1-2, pg. 59, In 3-17, pg. 83, In 5-13. *; | [A]US2004082926 (BRUNS DENNIS [US]) [A] 1-3, 11-16, 19-20 * ; entire document. *; | [YA]US2017021135 (ENGELHARDT BERNARD [CA]) [Y] 1-3, 11-13, 16, 20 * ; entire document, especially Figs. 2A-3B, para. [0130]. * [A] 15; | [Y]US2017216558 (HUGHETT DAVID [US], et al) [Y] 19-20 * ; entire document, especially Figs. 28-29; para. [0027], [0170]-[0173]. * | by applicant | DE3201539 | US2007239121 | US2011130728 | WO2015057999 | WO2016126555 | US2017021135 |