EP3689227 - WATERPROOF DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maxell, Ltd. 1, Koizumi, Oyamazaki Oyamazaki-cho Otokuni-gun Kyoto 618-8525 / JP | [2022/02] |
Former [2020/32] | For all designated states Maxell Holdings, Ltd. 1, Koizumi, Oyamazaki Oyamazaki-cho Otokuni-gun, Kyoto 618-8525 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FURUTANI Takahiro c/o MAXELL, LTD. 1, Koizumi, Oyamazaki Oyamazaki-cho Otokuni-gun Kyoto 618-8525 / JP | 02 /
NAKA Yasuhiro c/o MAXELL, LTD. 1, Koizumi, Oyamazaki Oyamazaki-cho Otokuni-gun Kyoto 618-8525 / JP | [2024/19] |
Former [2020/32] | 01 /
FURUTANI Takahiro c/o Maxell Holdings, Ltd. 1, Koizumi, Oyamazaki Oyamazaki-cho Otokuni-gun Kyoto 618-8525 / JP | ||
02 /
NAKA Yasuhiro c/o Maxell Holdings, Ltd. 1, Koizumi, Oyamazaki Oyamazaki-cho Otokuni-gun Kyoto 618-8525 / JP | Representative(s) | Diehl & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Erika-Mann-Straße 9 80636 München / DE | [2024/19] |
Former [2020/32] | Diehl & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB…Erika-Mann-Straße 9 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18861170.1 | 24.08.2018 | [2020/32] | WO2018JP31378 | Priority number, date | JP20170191440 | 29.09.2017 Original published format: JP 2017191440 | JP20180006258 | 18.01.2018 Original published format: JP 2018006258 | [2020/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019065029 | Date: | 04.04.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3689227 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3689227 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.04.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B5/01, A61M5/142, H01M12/06, H01M50/20, A61B5/0245, H01M8/04089, H01M12/08, H01M50/136 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
A61B5/01 (EP);
H01M50/14 (US);
A61B5/6833 (EP);
A61M5/14248 (EP);
G06F1/163 (US);
H01M12/06 (EP);
H01M12/08 (EP,US);
H01M50/136 (EP);
H01M50/141 (US);
H01M50/202 (US);
H01M8/04089 (EP);
A61B2560/0214 (EP);
A61B2560/0412 (EP);
A61B5/0245 (EP);
A61M2205/0238 (EP);
A61M2205/3303 (EP);
A61M2230/06 (EP);
A61M2230/42 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/24] | A61B5/00, A61B5/0245, H01M50/20, H01M12/06, A61M5/142, A61B5/01 | ||
Former IPC [2020/32] | A61B5/00, A61B5/0245, H01M2/10, H01M12/06, A61M5/142 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WASSERDICHTE VORRICHTUNG | [2020/32] | English: | WATERPROOF DEVICE | [2020/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉTANCHE À L'EAU | [2020/32] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2020 | Translation filed | 22.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 22.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/32] | 13.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007077485 (TAKAMURA KOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-11* paragraphs [0013] , [0014]; figures 1,2 *; | [X]WO2008005016 (CARDIOVU INC [US]) [X] 1-11 * paragraphs [0018] , [0032] , [0034]; figure 3; claim 5 *; | [X]JP5405500B (CORVENTIS INC) [X] 1-11 * paragraphs [0045] , [0046] , [0056] - [0058] *; | [X]US2016106914 (YODFAT OFER [IL], et al) [X] 1-11 * paragraphs [0016] , [0017] , [0019] , [0020] , [0024] , [0025] , [0028] , [0031] , [0032] - [0037]; figures 11a,11b * | International search | [Y]JPH08173775 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) [Y] 4-5, 7* , paragraphs [0031], [0047] (Family: none) *; | [Y]US2005280531 (FADEM KALFORD C [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * , claims, paragraphs [0015], [0016], fig. 1 & US 2007/0270678 A1 & WO 2006/009767 A1 *; | [Y]WO2009036316 (CORVENTIS INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * , claims, paragraphs [0080], [0096]-[0100], fig. 2A & US 2009/0076341 A1 *; | [XY]JP2010534084 (MEDINGO LTD.) [X] 1-2, 8-11 * , claims, paragraphs [0103], [0108], [0109], fig. 9 & WO 2009/013734 A2, claims, paragraphs [0096], [0101], [0102], fig. 9 & US 2010/0191078 A1 & CN 101815464 A * [Y] 1-11; | [Y]WO2011161822 (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al) [Y] 4-6 * , paragraphs [0094], [0104] & US 2012/0208096 A1, paragraphs [0098], [0108] & CN 102511107 A *; | [Y]JP2012011326 (HIRAMATSU SANGYO KK) [Y] 1-11 * , paragraphs [0005], [0006], [0032], [0033] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2017000370 (SHINKO ELECTRIC IND CO, et al) [Y] 1-11 * , claims, paragraphs [0013], [0044]-[0064], fig. 6-9 & US 2016/0360991 A1, claims, paragraphs [0022], [0053]-[0075], fig. 6A-9B *; | [Y]JP2017143053 (HITACHI MAXELL) [Y] 3 * , paragraph [0069] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP6186097B (OKA, Hideyo) [Y] 1-11 * , claims, paragraphs [0047], [0048], [0069], [0072], [0076], fig. 2, 3 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2017152086 (HITACHI MAXELL) [Y] 3 * , paragraph [0057] (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP2016505808 | JP2016515022 | JP2017000370 |